EP2583431 - PROCEDURE FOR COMMERCIAL COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/17] | SYSTEM AND PROCEDURE FOR COMMERCIAL COMMUNICATIONS | ||
[2019/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whisbi Technologies, S.L. C/ Tarragona 110 08015 Barcelona / ES | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTERO ESCOLÀ, José Luis C/ Santiago Rosinyol 3, 4 E-08750 Molins de Rei / ES | 02 /
BISBE TOSAT, Alex C/ Clementine Arderiu 26, 3- 1 E-08173 Sant Cugat Del Valles / ES | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Diaz Nunez, Joaquin J.D. Núñez Patentes y Marcas, S.L. Rambla Catalunya 120 08008 Barcelona / ES | [2019/49] |
Former [2013/17] | Diaz Nunez, Joaquin J.D. Núñez Patentes y Marcas, S.L. Rambla Catalunya 120 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 11738036.0 | 30.05.2011 | [2019/49] | WO2011IB01179 | Priority number, date | US20100815476 | 15.06.2010 Original published format: US 815476 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011158078 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583431 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2583431 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04M3/51, H04M7/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
H04L65/4015 (EP,BR,US);
H04M3/5191 (EP,BR,US);
H04M7/003 (EP,BR,US);
H04M2201/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | H04L29/06, H04M3/51 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | 18.12.2012 | ME | 18.12.2012 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR KOMMERZIELLE KOMMUNIKATION | [2019/35] | English: | PROCEDURE FOR COMMERCIAL COMMUNICATIONS | [2019/35] | French: | PROCÉDURE POUR COMMUNICATIONS COMMERCIALES | [2019/35] |
Former [2013/17] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR KOMMERZIELLE KOMMUNIKATION | ||
Former [2013/17] | SYSTEM AND PROCEDURE FOR COMMERCIAL COMMUNICATIONS | ||
Former [2013/17] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDURE POUR COMMUNICATIONS COMMERCIALES | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 29.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2011 | AL | 04.12.2019 | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | IE | 30.05.2020 | LU | 30.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.05.2011 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
IE | 30.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
IE | 30.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
IE | 30.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 30.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9844714 (COSMOCOM INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * page 10, line 16 - page 17, line 22; figure 1 * [I] 2-4,6-11; | [A]US2003118173 (BLUESTEIN JARED [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0012] - [0038] *; | [XI]US2009161843 (SYLVAIN DANY [CA]) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0031] - [0039] - [0050] , [0082] - [0084]; figures 1-3,5A,5B,12 * [I] 2-4,6-11; | [A] - ANTHONY LEONG, "Choosing a Web-Enabled Call Center Application", INTERNET CITATION, (19980815), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.mediacircus.net/callcenter.html, (20090617), XP002532574 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | Examination | US2003202088 |