EP2600863 - USE OF SIGMA LIGANDS IN OPIOID-INDUCED HYPERALGESIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESTEVE PHARMACEUTICALS, S.A. Passeig de la Zona Franca, 109, 4ª Planta 08038 Barcelona / ES | [2018/37] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states Laboratorios del Dr. Esteve, S.A. Avda. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Laboratorios del. Dr. Esteve, S.A. Avda Mare de Deu de Montserrat 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELA HERNÁNDEZ, José Miguel Rambla Badal nº 153, 8º 3ª 08028 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
ZAMANILLO-CASTANEDO, Daniel Avda. Mare de Déu de Montserrat 252, 5º 2ª 08041 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
PUIG RIERA de CONIAS, Margarita C/ Roger de Lluria 8, 3º 1ª 08010 Barcelona / ES | [2018/13] |
Former [2013/24] | 01 /
VELA HERNÁNDEZ, José Miguel Rambla Badal nº 153, 8º, 3ª E- 08028 Barcelona / ES | ||
02 /
ZAMANILLO-CASTANEDO, Daniel Avda. Mare de Dèu de Montserrat 252, 5º- 2ª E-08041 Barcelona / ES | |||
03 /
PUIG RIERA de CONIAS, Margarita C/ Roger de Lluria 8 3º1 E - 08010 Barcelona / ES | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 11738245.7 | 02.08.2011 | [2018/13] | WO2011EP63286 | Priority number, date | EP20100382215 | 03.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10382215 | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012016980 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2600863 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2600863 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, A61K31/4155, A61K31/5377, A61P23/00, A61P29/00 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,KR,US);
C07D231/22 (CN);
A61K31/4155 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (CN);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D207/36 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON SIGMA LIGANDEN IN OPIOID-INDUZIERTER HYPERALGÄSIE | [2017/40] | English: | USE OF SIGMA LIGANDS IN OPIOID-INDUCED HYPERALGESIA | [2013/24] | French: | UTILISATION DE LIGANDS SIGMA DANS L'HYPERALGÉSIE INDUITE PAR LES OPIOIDES | [2017/40] |
Former [2013/24] | VERWENDUNG VON SIGMALIGANDEN BEI OPIOIDINDUZIERTER HYPERALGESIE | ||
Former [2013/24] | UTILISATION DE LIGANDS SIGMA DANS UNE HYPERALGIE INDUITE PAR DES OPIOÏDES | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2011 | AL | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | DK | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | PL | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | RS | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | TR | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | MT | 02.08.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 02.08.2011 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MK | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
MT | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 02.08.2011 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
MT | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
MT | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
MT | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2116539 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * claims 9,10 *; | [Y]WO2007098953 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 25, line 21 - page 26, line 7 *; | [Y]WO2006021462 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 59, line 6 - page 60, line 5 *; | [Y]EP2113501 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0085]; claims 11-14 *; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Opioid-induced hyperalgesia", (2007), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080712205531/http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Opioid-induced_hyperalgesia, (20101001), XP002603149 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * | [Y] - CHIH-CHENG CHIEN ET AL, "Sigma antagonists potentiate opioid analgesia in rats", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, LIMERICK, IE, (19950101), vol. 190, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0304-3940(95)11504-P, ISSN 0304-3940, pages 137 - 139, XP002498085 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3940(95)11504-P | Examination | - SILVERMAN, "Opioid induced hyperalgesia...", PAIN PHYSICIAN, (2009), vol. 12, pages 679 - 684 | - LEE, "A comprehensive review of opioid induced", PAIN PHYSICIAN, (201101), vol. 14, pages 145 - 161 | by applicant | WO2009130310 | WO2006021462 | - SANDFORD,M. ET AL., PAIN PHYSICIAN, (2009), vol. 12, pages 679 - 684 | - MAO,J., PAIN, (2002), vol. 100, pages 213 - 217 | - GUIGNARD,B. ET AL., ANESTHESIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 93, pages 409 - 417 | - ANGST, M.S. ET AL., ANESTHESIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 104, pages 570 - 587 | - E. CELERIER ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2001), vol. 21, pages 4074 - 4080 | - TRESCOT,A.M. ET AL., PAIN PHYSICIAN, (2008), vol. 11, pages S12 - S16 | - SMITH,M.T., ACUTE PAIN, (2008), vol. 10, pages 199 - 200 | - MEI J, PASTERNAK GW, "Sigma 1 receptor modulation of opioid analgesia in the mouse", J PHARMACOL EXP THER., (2002), vol. 300, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1124/jpet.300.3.1070, pages 1070 - 1074, XP055362826 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.300.3.1070 | - CHIEN CC, PASTERNAK GW, "Sigma antagonists potentiate opioid analgesia in rats", NEUROSCI LETT, (1995), vol. 190, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-3940(95)11504-P, pages 137 - 139, XP002498085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3940(95)11504-P | - G. RONSISVALLE ET AL., PURE APPL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 73, pages 1499 - 1509 | - R. QUIRON ET AL., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1992), vol. 13, pages 85 - 86 | - M.L.LEITNER, EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (1994), vol. 259, pages 65 - 69 | - S.B. HELLEWELL, W.D. BOWEN, BRAIN RES, (1990), vol. 527, pages 244 - 253 | - PRASAD, P.D. ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (1998), vol. 70, no. 2, pages 443 - 451 | - IASP, Classification of chronic pain, IASP PRESS, (2002), page 211 |