EP2601492 - WIND POWER INSTALLATION WITH TORQUE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCTEngineering GmbH Erlenhof-Park Inselkammerstrasse 10 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON LÖBBECKE, Bernd Sandstr. 9c 82110 Germering / DE | 02 /
STEINACHER, Basti Friedenstrasse 34a 81671 München / DE | 03 /
SEENE, Christian Tegernseer Weg 15 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11738406.5 | 28.07.2011 | WO2011EP03798 | Priority number, date | DE20101033308 | 04.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010033308 | [2013/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012016664 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2601492 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/10, F03D7/04 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
G01L3/102 (EP);
F03D17/00 (EP);
F05B2270/821 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Title | German: | WINDKRAFTANLAGE MIT DREHMOMENTERFASSUNG | [2013/24] | English: | WIND POWER INSTALLATION WITH TORQUE DETECTION | [2013/24] | French: | ÉOLIENNE À DÉTECTION DE COUPLE | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 24.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 06.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2009193894 (KABATZKE WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 2* paragraph [0007] *; | [XY]US2009301224 (SIHLER CHRISTOF MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-11 * paragraphs [0025] , [0088] , [0089] , [0096] , [0097]; claims 1,6,11-13,17 * [Y] 2 |