EP2569267 - IMPROVED METHODS FOR PREPARING SQUALENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORA, Maninder Nektar Therapeutics 455 Mission Bay Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2013/52] |
Former [2013/12] | Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11738802.5 | 12.05.2011 | [2017/12] | WO2011IB01397 | Priority number, date | US20100395448P | 12.05.2010 Original published format: US 395448 P | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011141819 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569267 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2569267 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2569267 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/145, B01D3/10, C12N7/00, A61K39/39, A61K47/06, C07C7/04, A61K9/107 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,KR,US);
C07C11/21 (KR);
A61K31/01 (KR);
A61K39/145 (KR,US);
A61K47/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (KR);
A61K47/24 (KR);
A61K9/107 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
B01D3/10 (KR,US);
B01D3/143 (US);
B01L3/10 (US);
C07C7/04 (EP,KR,US);
C12N7/00 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C7/04, C07C11/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/12] | C07C11/21, C07C7/04, A61K9/107, A61K31/01, A61K39/39, A61K47/06, A61P31/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SQUALEN | [2013/12] | English: | IMPROVED METHODS FOR PREPARING SQUALENE | [2013/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS AMÉLIORÉS D'ÉLABORATION DE SQUALÈNE | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 15.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13164769.5 / EP2620423 | EP16176832.0 / EP3103784 | EP19151232.6 / EP3489211 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.2014
01.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE GLAXO SMITHKLINE BIOLOGICALS S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE Opponent's representative Furstoss, Olivia Aline GSK W23-F3 20, avenue Fleming 1300 Wavre / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.2014
01.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE GLAXO SMITHKLINE BIOLOGICALS S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE Opponent's representative Furstoss, Olivia Aline GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex, TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2016/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.2014
01.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE GLAXO SMITHKLINE BIOLOGICALS S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE Opponent's representative Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2014/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.2014
01.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE GLAXO SMITHKLINE BIOLOGICALS S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE Opponent's representative Robertson, James Stuart GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | 03.11.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.05.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.05.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.01.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2011 | AL | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | HR | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MK | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | RS | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | SM | 25.12.2013 | NO | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | IE | 12.05.2014 | LU | 12.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.05.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MK | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
Former [2017/42] | HU | 12.05.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.05.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | |
NO | 25.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [I]JPH06116171 (NIPPON FINE CHEMICAL CO) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] * * abstract *; | [XDI]WO2007052155 (NOVARTIS VACCINES & DIAGNOSTIC [IT], et al) [XD] 12,13,17,20-23 * claims 1,18 * * page 16, paragraph 7 * * paragraph 9 - page 19, paragraph 5 * [I] 14-16,18,19; | [IA]CN101597204 (UNIV TIANJIN [CN]) [I] 2-11 * examples 1-3 *[A] 1; | [IA]WO2010004193 (SOPHIM [FR], et al) [I] 2-11 * page 32, line 23 - page 33, line 11; example 7 * * page 33, line 15 - line 33; example 8 * [A] 1 | Examination | - SULI J ET AL, "Experimental squalene adjuvant - I. Preparation and testing of its effectiveness", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, (20040903), vol. 22, no. 25-26, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2004.02.023, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3464 - 3469, XP004526924 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2004.02.023 | by applicant | US4060082 | EP0139417 | WO9014837 | EP0520618 | WO9737000 | WO9801174 | WO9907820 | US5971953 | WO0007647 | WO0122992 | WO02097072 | US6692468 | WO2005089837 | US2007014805 | WO2007052155 | US2007191314 | WO2008043774 | - BORUCINSKA, FRASCA, J FISH DISEASES, (2002), vol. 25, pages 287 - 98 | - BERTONE ET AL., J FISH DISEASES, (1996), vol. 19, pages 429 - 34 | - BRIONES ET AL., J VET MED B, (1998), vol. 45, pages 443 - 5 | - PODDA, DEL GIUDICE, EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 197 - 203 | - PODDA, VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2673 - 2680 | - Vaccine Adjuvants: Preparation Methods and Research Protocols (Volume 42 of Methods in Molecular Medicine series, vol. 42 | - SULI ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, no. 25-26, pages 3464 - 9 | - HOFFMANN ET AL., VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, pages 3165 - 3170 | - SUBBARAO ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2003), vol. 305, pages 192 - 200 | - LIU ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2003), vol. 314, pages 580 - 590 | - OZAKIET, J. VIROL, (2004), vol. 78, pages 1851 - 1857 | - OZAKI ET AL., J: J.VIROL., (2004), vol. 78, pages 1851 - 1857 | - WEBBY ET AL., LANCET, (2004), vol. 363, pages 1099 - 1103 | - BRANDS ET AL., DEV BIOL STAND, (1999), vol. 98, pages 93 - 100 | - HALPERIN ET AL., VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, pages 1240 - 7 | - TREE ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 3444 - 50 | - KISTNER ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 960 - 8 | - KISTNER ET AL., DEV BIOL STAND, (1999), vol. 98, pages 101 - 110 | - BRUHL ET AL., VACCINE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 1149 - 58 | - PAU ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2716 - 21 | - HEHME ET AL., VIRUS RES., (2004), vol. 103, no. 1-2, pages 163 - 71 | - TREANOR ET AL., J INFECT DIS, (1996), vol. 173, pages 1467 - 70 | - KEITEL ET AL., CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 3, pages 507 - 10 | - WILLIAMSON ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2006), vol. 74, pages 961 - 7 | - LOUKAS ET AL., PLOS MED, (2005), vol. 2, no. 10, page E295 | - HARPER ET AL., LANCET, (2004), vol. 364, no. 9447, pages 1757 - 65 | - J TOXICOL CLIN TOXICOL, (2001), vol. 39, pages 85 - 100 | - DEMICHELI ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 880 - 884 | - STEPANOV ET AL., J BIOTECHNOL, (1996), vol. 44, pages 155 - 160 | - BANZHOFF, IMMUNOLOGY LETTERS, (2000), vol. 71, pages 91 - 96 | - GREENBAUM ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, pages 2566 - 77 | - ZURBRIGGEN ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 295 - 304 | - PIASCIK, JAM PHARM ASSOC (WASH DC)., (2003), vol. 43, pages 728 - 30 | - MANN ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, pages 2425 - 9 | - HALPERIN ET AL., AM J PUBLIC HEALTH, (1979), vol. 69, pages 1247 - 50 | - HERBERT ET AL., J INFECT DIS, (1979), vol. 140, pages 234 - 8 | - CHEN ET AL., VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 2830 - 6 | Opposition | CN101830770 | JP2000191550 | CN1810744 | WO2008142175 | JPH06116171 | JP3484227B | CN101597204 | WO2010092479 | - Focetria TM EPAR - Assessment Report - Variation | - Internet page on "Vacuum distillation" (page available 23 April 2010) http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Vacuum distillation&oldid=288287808 | - PIETSCH A. ET AL, "Concentration of squalene from shark liver oil by short-path distillation", EUR. J. LIPID SCI. TECHNOL., (2007), vol. 109, doi:doi:10.1002/ejlt.200700039, pages 1077 - 1082, XP055055506 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejlt.200700039 | - CN 101830770 A (ENGLISH TRANSLATION), & CN101830770 A 00000000 | - MAKIDON P.E. ET AL, "Characterization of Stability and Nasal Delivery Systems for Immunization with Nanoemulsion-Based Vaccines", JOURNAL OF AEROSOL MEDICINE AND PULMONARY DRUG DELIVERY, (2010), vol. 23, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1089/jamp.2009.0766, pages 77 - 89, XP055114283 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/jamp.2009.0766 | - OTT G. ET AL, Methods in Molecular Medicine, TOTOWA NJ, HUMAN PRESS, (2000), vol. 42, pages 211 - 228 | - OTT G. ET AL, Vaccine Design, the Subunit and Adjuvant Approach Pharmaceutical Biotechnology, (1995), vol. 6, pages 277 - 296 | - BRITO J.A. ET AL, "An alternative renewable of squalene for use in emulsion adjuvants", VACCINE, (2011), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.06.067, pages 6262 - 6268, XP028263655 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.06.067 | - JP 2000191550 A (ORIGINAL DOCUMENT), & JP2000191550 A 00000000 | - re-translation of sections of D13a | - CN 1810744A (Original document), & CN1810744 A 00000000 | - JP3484227 B2 (Original document) | - internet page, http://www.ema.europa.eu/ema/index.jsp?curl=pages/medicines/hu man/medicines/000710/human_med_000796.jsp&mid=WC0b01ac08001d1 24 (accessed 24.09.2014) | - WO 2008 142175 A1 (ORIGINAL DOCUMENT), & WO2008142175 A1 00000000 | - FOX C.B. ET AL, "Monitoring the effects of component structure and source on formulation stability and adjuvant activity of oil-in-water emulsions", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES, B: BIOINTERFACES, (2008), vol. 65, doi:doi:10.1016/j.colsurfb.2008.03.003, pages 98 - 105, XP022710121 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfb.2008.03.003 | - internet citation http://lorien.ncl.ac.uk/ming/distil/distilop.htm | - internet citation http://lorien.ncl.ac.uk/ming/distil/distilvle.htm | - MAKIDON P.E. ET AL, "Pre-Clinical Evaluation of a Novel Nanoemulsion-Based Hepatitis B Mucosal Vaccine", PLOS ONE, (200808), vol. 3, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0002954, pages 1 - 15, XP002676516 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0002954 | - NERGIZ C. ET AL, "The effect of consecutive steps of refining on squalene content of vegetable oils", J. FOOD SCI. TECHNOL., (201106), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 382 - 385 | - Costello, "Distillation an introduction", from http://www..rccostello.com/distil/distrilpri.htm, cited 18.04.2016 |