EP2603072 - DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AN ANIMAL AND CORRESPONDING MANUFACTURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allflex Europe Route des Eaux ZI de Plague 35500 Vitré / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Allflex Europe Route des Eaux ZI de Plague 35500 Vitre / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECALUWE, Johan 10B allée Marc Sangnier F-53000 Laval / FR | 02 /
HILPERT, Jean-Jacques 53 rue Anatole Le Braz F-35500 Vitre / FR | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Milon, Marie-Anne Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11739068.2 | 03.08.2011 | WO2011EP63407 | Priority number, date | FR20100056520 | 09.08.2010 Original published format: FR 1056520 | [2013/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012019956 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2603072 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01K11/00 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
A01K11/004 (EP,US);
G06K19/07786 (US);
G06K19/0723 (US);
G06K19/07724 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES TIERS UND HERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2013/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AN ANIMAL AND CORRESPONDING MANUFACTURING DEVICE | [2013/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN ANIMAL ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 11.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2007103314 (GEISSLER RANDOLPH K [US]) [X] 5,7 * paragraphs [0054] , [0 56] , [0061] - [0073]; figures 2-13 * [Y] 1-4,6; | [A]WO2009089215 (ERIGINATE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-7* paragraphs [0026] - [0081]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]WO2010063287 (BR TECHNIC V HENRIK RISBO JEPP [DK], et al) [Y] 1-4,6 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 18 * * page 6, line 33 - page 10, line 3; figures 2,6 * | by applicant | EP2191715 |