EP2596071 - TRANSDERMAL ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS, DEVICES, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIZIO, James P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Elizabeth E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55 / US | 03 /
WU, Zheng Zhi 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
PRESZLER PRINCE, Amy 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2019/07] |
Former [2013/22] | 01 /
DIZIO, James P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
JOHNSON, Elizabeth E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55 / US | |||
03 /
WU, Zheng Zhi 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
PRESZLER PRINCE, Amy 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/07] |
Former [2013/22] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11739245.6 | 19.07.2011 | [2019/07] | WO2011US44522 | Priority number, date | US20100366358P | 21.07.2010 Original published format: US 366358 P | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012012417 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2596071 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2596071 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09J4/06, A61K9/00, C09J133/00 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
C09J4/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61L24/06 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C08F220/1808 (EP,KR,US);
C09J133/08 (EP,US);
C09J133/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F220/1808, C08F218/08, C08F220/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSDERMALE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2018/52] | English: | TRANSDERMAL ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS, DEVICES, AND METHODS | [2013/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ADHÉSIVES TRANSDERMIQUES, DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS | [2013/22] |
Former [2013/22] | TRANSDERMALE HAFTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19155852.7 / EP3517105 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2011 | AL | 13.02.2019 | AT | 13.02.2019 | CY | 13.02.2019 | CZ | 13.02.2019 | DK | 13.02.2019 | EE | 13.02.2019 | FI | 13.02.2019 | HR | 13.02.2019 | IT | 13.02.2019 | LT | 13.02.2019 | LV | 13.02.2019 | MC | 13.02.2019 | MK | 13.02.2019 | MT | 13.02.2019 | NL | 13.02.2019 | PL | 13.02.2019 | RO | 13.02.2019 | RS | 13.02.2019 | SE | 13.02.2019 | SI | 13.02.2019 | SK | 13.02.2019 | SM | 13.02.2019 | TR | 13.02.2019 | BG | 13.05.2019 | NO | 13.05.2019 | GR | 14.05.2019 | IS | 13.06.2019 | PT | 13.06.2019 | IE | 19.07.2019 | LU | 19.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 13.02.2019 | |
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0130316 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [XD]US6335031 (ASMUSSEN BODO [DE], et al) [XD] 1-39 * the whole document * * column 2 - column 4 *; | [X]US2002119187 (CANTOR ADAM S [US], et al) [X] 1-39 * the whole document ** paragraph [0075] *; | [X]WO2005049090 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-39 * the whole document * * page 9 * | by applicant | USRE24906E | US6335031 | - F.W. BILLMEYER, Textbook of Polymer Science, Second Edition, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, (1971), page 84,85 |