Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
04.07.2014 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
04.07.2014 | Change - classification | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
04.07.2014 | Change - classification | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
05.03.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.04.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
20.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.03.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.11.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
09.11.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
05.09.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.08.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.08.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.12.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.09.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.08.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.08.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication |