EP2531620 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF RENAL INJURY AND RENAL FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astute Medical, Inc. Blg 2 R. 645 3550 General Atomics Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERBERG, Joseph 470 Delage Court Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
GRAY, Jeff 417 Bay Meadows Way Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | 03 /
MCPHERSON, Paul 1449 Elva Court Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 04 /
NAKAMURA, Kevin 2409 Newcastle Ave Cardiff by the Sea, CA 92007 / US | 05 /
KAMPF, James, Patrick 5882 Gablewood Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/50] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11740468.1 | 04.02.2011 | [2016/50] | WO2011US23830 | Priority number, date | US20100302021P | 05.02.2010 Original published format: US 302021 P | US20100302025P | 05.02.2010 Original published format: US 302025 P | US20100302026P | 05.02.2010 Original published format: US 302026 P | US20100302027P | 05.02.2010 Original published format: US 302027 P | US20100302036P | 05.02.2010 Original published format: US 302036 P | US20100374060P | 16.08.2010 Original published format: US 374060 P | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011097539 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531620 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2531620 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/567 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/6863 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/86 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N2333/4745 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2333/522 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2333/96447 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND PROGNOSE VON NIERENVERLETZUNGEN UND NIERENINSUFFIZIENZ | [2012/50] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF RENAL INJURY AND RENAL FAILURE | [2012/50] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISABLES POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE PRONOSTIC D'UNE LÉSION RÉNALE ET D'UNE INSUFFISANCE RÉNALE | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 13.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13177829.2 / EP2666872 | EP16203655.2 Application refused : 27.05.2017 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2011 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | IE | 04.02.2017 | LU | 04.02.2017 | MT | 04.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 04.02.2017 | ||
LU | 04.02.2017 | ||
MT | 04.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 04.02.2017 | ||
LU | 04.02.2017 | ||
MT | 04.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 04.02.2017 | ||
LU | 04.02.2017 | ||
MT | 04.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 04.02.2017 | ||
LU | 04.02.2017 | ||
MT | 04.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 04.02.2017 | ||
LU | 04.02.2017 | ||
MT | 04.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 04.02.2017 | ||
LU | 04.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 04.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - SHLIPAK MICHAEL G ET AL, "Elevations of inflammatory and procoagulant biomarkers in elderly persons with renal insufficiency.", CIRCULATION, (20030107), vol. 107, no. 1, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 87 - 92, XP002698520 [X] 1,2,5,10-15 * tables 2-4 * [I] 3,4,6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000042700.48769.59 | [XI] - FRIED LINDA ET AL, "Inflammatory and prothrombotic markers and the progression of renal disease in elderly individuals", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, (200412), vol. 15, no. 12, ISSN 1046-6673, pages 3184 - 3191, XP002698521 [X] 1,2,5,10-15 * page 3186, column l, paragraph l; table 2 * * page 3186, column r, paragraph 2 * [I] 3,4,6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.ASN.0000146422.45434 | [A] - EDELSTEIN CHARLES L, "Biomarkers of Acute Kidney Injury", Advances in Chronic Kidney Disease, (200807), PubMed Central (PMC) Author Manuscript, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC3287955/pdf/nihms-200858.pdf, (20130611), XP002698396 [A] 1-15 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.ackd.2008.04.003 | International search | [X]US7235358 (WOHLGEMUTH JAY [US], et al); | [A]US2009203588 (WILLMAN CHERYL L [US], et al); | [A]US2009258002 (BARRETT J CARL [US], et al) | by applicant | US5480792 | US5525524 | US5571698 | US5631171 | US5679526 | US5824799 | US5851776 | US5885527 | US5922615 | US5939272 | US5947124 | US5955377 | US5985579 | US6019944 | US6057098 | US6113855 | US6143576 | - Harrison's Principles of Internal Medicine, MCGRAW HILL, pages 1741 - 1830 | - Current Medical Diagnosis & Treatment, MCGRAW HILL, (2008), pages 785 - 815 | - "Chapter 222", BEERS M.H. ET AL, Merck Manual of Diagnosis and Therapy. 17th ed. | - PRAUGHT; SHLIPAK, CURR OPIN NEPHROL HYPERTENS, (2005), vol. 14, pages 265 - 270 | - CHERTOW ET AL., JAM SOC NEPHROL, (2005), vol. 16, pages 3365 - 3370 | - LASSNIGG, J AM SOC NEPHROL, (2004), vol. 15, pages 1597 - 1605 | - BELLOMO ET AL., CRIT CARE, (2004), vol. 8, no. 4, pages R204 - R212 | - KELLUM, CRIT. CARE MED., (2008), vol. 36, pages 141 - 145 | - RICCI ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (2008), vol. 73, pages 538 - 546 | - MEHTA ET AL., CRIT. CARE, (2007), vol. 11, page R31 | - MCCOLLOUGH ET AL., REV CARDIOVASC MED., (2006), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 177 - 197 | - SHLIPAK ET AL., "Elevations of onflammatory and proagulant biomarkers in elderly persons with renal insufficiency", CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 107, no. 1, pages 87 - 92 | - FRIED ET AL., "Inflammatory and prothrombic markers and the progression of renal disease in elderly individuals", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, (2004), vol. 15, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1097/01.ASN.0000146422.45434, pages 3184 - 3191, XP002698521 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.ASN.0000146422.45434 | - EDELSTEIN, "Biomarkers of acute kidney injury", ADVANCES IN CHRONIC KIDNEY DISEASE, (2008), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 222 - 234 | - THAKAR ET AL., J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2005), vol. 16, pages 162 - 168 | - MEHRAN ET AL., J. AM. COLL. CARDIOL., (2004), vol. 44, pages 1393 - 1399 | - WIJEYSUNDERA ET AL., JAMA, (2007), vol. 297, pages 1801 - 1809 | - GOLDSTEIN; CHAWLA, CLIN. J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2010), vol. 5, pages 943 - 949 | - CHAWLA ET AL., KIDNEY INTL., (2005), vol. 68, pages 2274 - 2280 | - WILSON, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1994), vol. 175, pages 267 - 273 | - YARMUSH, J. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. METHODS, (1992), vol. 25, pages 85 - 97 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - VAN ERP ET AL., J. IMMUNOASSAY, (1991), vol. 12, pages 425 - 443 | - NELSON; GRISWOLD, COMPUT. METHODS PROGRAMS BIOMED., (1988), vol. 27, pages 65 - 68 | - CWIRLA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6378 - 6382 | - DEVLIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 404 - 406 | - SCOTT; SMITH, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 386 - 388 | - FISCHER ET AL., INTENSIVE CARE MED., (2003), vol. 29, pages 1043 - 1051 | - BAGSHAW ET AL., NEPHROL. DIAL. TRANSPLANT, (2008), vol. 23, pages 1203 - 1210 | - HANLEY, J. A.; MCNEIL, B.J., "The meaning and use of the area under a receiver operating characteristic (ROC) curve", RADIOLOGY, (1982), vol. 143, pages 29 - 36, XP002378736 |