|
15.02.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
100 |
|
22.10.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
22.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2012 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
03.09.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
125 |