Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019328898 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | US201615071146 | 15.03.2016 | US201113022905 | 08.02.2011 | US201314106444 | 13.12.2013 | US201816216841 | 11.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016256563 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | US201615071146 | 15.03.2016 | US201113022905 | 08.02.2011 | US201314106444 | 13.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9308278 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2016 | B2 | US2014194601 | 10.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | US201113022905 | 08.02.2011 | US201314106444 | 13.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8609092 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2013 | B2 | US2011217321 | 08.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | US201113022905 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101510413B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2015 | B1 | KR20120125643 | 16.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6046494B | Global Dossier | 14.12.2016 | B2 | JP2013518912 | 23.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL221205 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3395361 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | EP11740529 | 08.02.2011 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106975082 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201180008612 | 08.02.2011 | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102844045 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2789230 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2019 | C | CA2789230 | 11.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018271337 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | AU2017200600 | 30.01.2017 | AU2018271337 | 29.11.2018 | AU2011213609 | 08.02.2011 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017200600B | Global Dossier | 08.11.2018 | B2 | AU2017200600 | 16.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | AU2017200600 | 30.01.2017 | AU2011213609 | 08.02.2011 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011213609B | Global Dossier | 03.11.2016 | B2 | AU2011213609 | 06.09.2012 | A2 | AU2011213609 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2533804 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2018 | B1 | EP2533804 | 13.11.2013 | A4 | EP2533804 | 19.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012019780 | 01.09.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA201201120 | 29.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2668645T | 21.05.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012008884 | 31.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA115517 | 27.11.2017 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | WO2011US24055 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011097627 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019131616 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6529478B | Global Dossier | 12.06.2019 | B2 | JP2017095459 | 01.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI504410B | 21.10.2015 | B | TW201138818 | 16.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US30248910 | 08.02.2010 | Type | Divisional application | EP3395361 |