Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012079175 | ![]() | 21.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013105377 | ![]() | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | US201113578290 | 10.02.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11498853 | ![]() | 15.11.2022 | B2 | US2019315637 | 17.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213578290 | 21.11.2012 | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | US201916279221 | 19.02.2019 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10377647 | ![]() | 13.08.2019 | B2 | US2014076810 | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113993890 | 15.12.2011 | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018114497 | ![]() | 26.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6599082B | ![]() | 30.10.2019 | B2 | JP2014501168 | 20.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6431658B | ![]() | 28.11.2018 | B2 | JP2013518718 | 23.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL226915 | ![]() | 29.03.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL221391 | ![]() | 26.09.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3653584 | ![]() | 20.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | EP11741795 | 10.02.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2651992 | ![]() | 22.01.2020 | B1 | EP2651992 | 05.07.2017 | A4 | EP2651992 | 23.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103459439B | ![]() | 12.09.2017 | B | CN103459439 | 18.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102892713B | ![]() | 04.05.2016 | B | CN102892713 | 23.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2821789 | ![]() | 29.12.2020 | C | CA2821789 | 21.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | CA2821789 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2789498 | ![]() | 02.04.2019 | C | CA2789498 | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011342287B | ![]() | 17.09.2015 | B2 | AU2011342287 | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011214865B | ![]() | 05.11.2015 | B2 | AU2011214865 | 06.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2534106 | ![]() | 16.10.2019 | B1 | EP2534106 | 06.01.2016 | A4 | EP2534106 | 19.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012020112 | 24.08.2021 | B1 | BR112012020112 | 11.08.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013014972 | 29.12.2020 | B1 | BR112013014972 | 17.12.2019 | A8 | BR112013014972 | 13.09.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1177927 | 30.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX364273 | 22.04.2019 | B | MX2012009296 | 06.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX363651 | 28.03.2019 | B | MX2013006797 | 13.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG183909 | 30.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG191138 | 31.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201304437 | 27.01.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US201161522424 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011CA50777 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011CA50075 | 10.02.2011 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011097727 | ![]() | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018103180 | ![]() | 05.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016128164 | ![]() | 14.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201501027X | 29.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US30317010 | 10.02.2010 | US42345810 | 15.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | EP3653584 |