EP2651262 - ORAL CARE DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIMENEZ, Eduardo J. 21 Manor Drive Manalapan, New Jersey 07726 / US | 02 /
KENNEDY, Sharon 4213 Holbrook Road Randallstown, Maryland 21133 / US | 03 /
SORRENTINO, Alan 17 Adams Drive Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | 04 /
GATZEMEYER, John J. 85 Rohill Road Hillsborough, New Jersey 08844 / US | 05 /
ROONEY, Michael 63 Locust Avenue Millburn, New Jersey 07041 / US | 06 /
FATTORI, Joseph E. 10 Jacobs Meadow Road East Sandwich, Massachusetts 02537 / US | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11743408.4 | 01.08.2011 | WO2011US46132 | Priority number, date | WO2010US60874 | 22.12.2010 Original published format: PCT/US2010/060874 | US20100423414P | 15.12.2010 Original published format: US 423414 P | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012082185 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2651262 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2651262 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A46B11/02, A45D34/04 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
A46B11/0027 (EP,RU,US);
A46B11/00 (KR);
A46B11/0034 (EP,US);
A46B11/0065 (EP,US);
A45D2200/055 (EP,US);
A45D33/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDER FÜR EIN MUNDPFLEGEPRODUKT | [2014/19] | English: | ORAL CARE DISPENSER | [2013/43] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRODUIT DE SOIN BUCCAL | [2014/19] |
Former [2013/43] | MUNDPFLEGESPENDER | ||
Former [2013/43] | DISTRIBUTEUR DE SOINS D'HYGIÈNE BUCCALE | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 24.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14162811.5 / EP2752128 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.10.2014 | AT | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | DK | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | FI | 22.10.2014 | HR | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MK | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | RS | 22.10.2014 | SE | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | SM | 22.10.2014 | NO | 22.01.2015 | GR | 23.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | PT | 23.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MK | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 22.10.2014 | |
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 22.10.2014 | |
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9818695 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]US6345629 (VIVES JOSEPH ANTOINE [FR]); | [A]US2006207627 (THORPE RICHARD C [GB], et al) | by applicant | US19720114033 |