EP2537451 - POSITION DETECTING SYSTEM AND POSITION DETECTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Change - inventor | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIDA, Takahiro OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | 01 /
IIDA, Takahiro OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
Former [2012/52] | 01 /
IIDA, Takahiro c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11744452.1 | 13.01.2011 | WO2011JP50402 | Priority number, date | JP20100033664 | 18.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010033664 | [2012/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011102161 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537451 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/04, A61B5/06 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B1/00158 (EP,US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/52] | A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Title | German: | POSITIONSERKENNUNGSSYSTEM UND POSITIONSERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2012/52] | English: | POSITION DETECTING SYSTEM AND POSITION DETECTING METHOD | [2012/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE POSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE POSITION | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2012 | Translation filed | 29.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2105085 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 1,5 *; | [A]EP2016897 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 1-3B *; | [A]WO2009019916 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [P]EP2177148 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0122] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1932463 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0130] * * figures 1-10 * | International search | [Y]WO2007123217 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009226080 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [Y]JP2009039356 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP, et al); | [A]JP2008079913 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [A]JP2007175317 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]WO2007043458 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2009041524 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2006271520 |