EP2536523 - A CUTTING INSERT HAVING CUTTING EDGES DIVIDED BY RECESSES AND A MILLING CUTTER PROVIDED WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TaeguTec Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun, Daegu 711-865 / KR | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Chang Hee C/O TaeguTec Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun Daegu 711-865 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Chang Gyu C/O TaeguTec Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalseong-gun Daegu 711-865 / KR | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11744912.4 | 18.02.2011 | WO2011KR01089 | Priority number, date | KR20100015388 | 19.02.2010 Original published format: KR 20100015388 | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011102670 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2536523 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22, B23C5/20, B23B27/16 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
B23C5/06 (EP,KR,US);
B23C5/205 (KR);
B23C5/202 (EP,US);
B23C2200/0416 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/128 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/205 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/326 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/367 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T407/1906 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1924 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1934 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1962 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEEINSATZ MIT DURCH EINSPARUNGEN GETEILTEN SCHNEIDEKANTEN UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETES FRÄSWERKZEUG | [2012/52] | English: | A CUTTING INSERT HAVING CUTTING EDGES DIVIDED BY RECESSES AND A MILLING CUTTER PROVIDED WITH THE SAME | [2012/52] | French: | PLAQUETTE DE COUPE COMPORTANT DES BORDS TRANCHANTS DIVISÉS PAR DES DÉPRESSIONS ET UNE FRAISE DISPOSÉE AVEC CEUX-CI | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 03.12.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3701187 (ERKFRITZ DONALD S); | [A]US4531864 (BYLUND SVEN O [SE]); | [A]JPH067856Y (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [A]KR20020077909 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AB); | [A]JP2007283482 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]KR20090104668 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP.) |