EP2605811 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AND/OR MONITORING FOREIGN STRUCTURES IN A FLUID OR IN A FLUID STREAM, AND METHOD FOR DOING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kroener-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIKTOR, Christoph Am Platz 5 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11745700.2 | 12.08.2011 | [2015/43] | WO2011EP04072 | Priority number, date | DE20101034553 | 17.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010034553 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012022456 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2605811 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2605811 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
A61M1/3626 (EP,US);
G01N33/49 (US);
A61M1/3622 (EP,US);
G01N29/02 (US);
A61M1/36222 (EP,US);
A61M1/367 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG UND/ODER ÜBERWACHUNG VON FREMDSTRUKTUREN IN EINEM FLUID ODER EINEM FLUIDSTROM SOWIE VERFAHREN HIERZU | [2013/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AND/OR MONITORING FOREIGN STRUCTURES IN A FLUID OR IN A FLUID STREAM, AND METHOD FOR DOING SAME | [2013/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ET/OU DE CONTRÔLE DE STRUCTURES ÉTRANGÈRES DANS UN FLUIDE OU DANS UN ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 10.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2011 | AL | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | MT | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 12.08.2011 | |
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.08.2011 | |
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.08.2011 | |
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.08.2011 | |
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]JPH07103967 (SYST SUTATSUKU KK) [AD] 1,11,16-19* abstract *; | [X]EP0980686 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12,15-19 * paragraphs [0015] - [0024] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US6740036 (LEE LIAN-PIN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,10,11,15-19 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 48 * * figures 1, 3 *; | [X]US2006287628 (HIRABUKI MAKOTO [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,10-12,15-19 * paragraphs [0088] - [0114] * * figure 1 *; | [XI]US2009078047 (DAM NAIM [US]) [X] 1-4,6-12,15-19 * paragraphs [0012] - [0026] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 5,13,14 | by applicant | US3935876 | US4122713 | JPH07103967B | EP0979111 | WO2007121398 |