EP2606291 - COOLANT CONDENSER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstr. 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVID, Guillaume 598 Jacob Way, 205 48307 Rochester / US | 02 /
FÖRSTER, Uwe Sommerhaldenstr. 17 71729 Erdmannhausen / DE | 03 /
JUNG, Matthias Bergheimer Str. 27 70499 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
KEMLE, Andreas Mergentheimer Weg 29 71732 Tamm / DE | 05 /
WALTER, Christoph Werner-Haas-Weg 32 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 06 /
HOFMANN, Herbert Lämmleshalde 43 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/31] |
Former [2013/33] | 01 /
DAVID, Guillaume Stubaierstr. 3 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
FÖRSTER, Uwe Sommerhaldenstr. 17 71729 Erdmannhausen / DE | |||
03 /
JUNG, Matthias Bergheimer str. 27 70499 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
KEMLE, Andreas Mergentheimer Weg 29 71732 Tamm / DE | |||
05 /
WALTER, Christoph Werner-Haas-Weg 32 70469 Stuttgart / DE | |||
06 /
HOFMANN, Herbert Lämmleshalde 43 70376 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2013/26] | 01 /
DAVID, Guillaume Stubaierstr. 3 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
FÖRSTER, Uwe Sommerhaldenstr. 17 71729 Erdmannhausen / DE | |||
03 /
JUNG, Matthias Thaerstr. 36 70499 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
KEMLE, Andreas Mozartstr. 26 71732 Tamm / DE | |||
05 /
WALTER, Christoph Werner-Haas-Weg 32 70469 Stuttgart / DE | |||
06 /
HOFMANN, Herbert Lämmleshalde 43 70376 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/31] |
Former [2013/26] | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11745804.2 | 19.08.2011 | [2019/31] | WO2011EP64322 | Priority number, date | DE20101039518 | 19.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010039518 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012022807 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2606291 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2606291 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F25B39/04 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
F25B39/04 (EP);
F25B2339/044 (EP);
F25B2500/01 (EP);
F25B40/02 (EP);
F25B40/04 (EP);
F28D2021/0084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEMITTELKONDENSATORBAUGRUPPE | [2013/26] | English: | COOLANT CONDENSER ASSEMBLY | [2013/26] | French: | MODULE DE CONDENSEUR À RÉFRIGÉRANT | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 14.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.02.2019 | 19.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 19.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2011 | AL | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | HR | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | RS | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | SM | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | AT | 19.08.2019 | IE | 19.08.2019 | LU | 19.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | FR | 30.09.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | GB | 31.10.2019 | NO | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 19.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GB | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 19.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GB | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 19.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GB | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 19.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GB | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GB | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
NO | 31.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5482112 (SASAKI HIRONAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11; | [A]JPH11211277 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP)[A] 1-11; | [X]JP2003021432 (ZEXEL VALEO CLIMATE CONTR CORP) [X] 8,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP1531309 (CALSONIC KANSEI UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1577629 (BEHR LORRAINE SARL [FR]) [Y] 2,4-6 * figure 2 *; | [XYI]FR2915793 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [X] 1,7-9,11 * page 12, line 4 - page 13, line 25 * [Y] 2,4-6 [I] 3,10 | by applicant | DE102007018722 |