EP2601808 - METHOD, PUBLIC LAND MOBILE NETWORK AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NENNER, Karl Heinz Kolpingweg 9 53332 Bornheim / DE | 02 /
JACOBSOHN, Dieter Holtorferstrasse 32 b 53229 Bonn / DE | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11745926.3 | 03.08.2011 | WO2011EP03884 | Priority number, date | US20100370609P | 04.08.2010 Original published format: US 370609 P | EP20100008131 | 04.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10008131 | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012016688 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2601808 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, ÖFFENTLICHES LANDFUNKNETZ UND BENUTZERGERÄT | [2013/24] | English: | METHOD, PUBLIC LAND MOBILE NETWORK AND USER EQUIPMENT | [2013/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, RÉSEAU MOBILE TERRESTRE PUBLIC ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 05.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 12.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009095336 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 28, line 22 - line 23 * * page 10, line 6 - line 13 * * page 11, line 4 - line 11 * * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 8 * * page 15, line 14 * * page 26, line 30 - line 35 ** figure 5 *; | [I] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Architectural requirements (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.221, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100610), no. V9.4.0, pages 1 - 48, XP050441556 [I] 1-14 * Section 7.2a * | [A] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); LTE; Non-Access-Stratum (NAS) protocol for Evolved Packet System (EPS); Stage 3 (3GPP TS 24.301 version 9.3.0 Release 9)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20100601), vol. 3GPP CT 1, no. V9.3.0, XP014047222 [A] 1-14 * Section 4.3 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; 3GPP IMS Management Object (MO); Stage 3 (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 24.167, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100614), no. V9.2.0, pages 1 - 33, XP050441634 [A] 1-14 * Section 5.27 * | Examination | US2002085537 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; General Packet Radio Service (GPRS); Service description; Stage 2 (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.060, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100610), no. V10.0.0, pages 1 - 303, XP050441548 |