EP2606632 - A METHOD OF SCANNING DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kodak Alaris Inc. 2400 Mount Read Boulevard Rochester, NY 14650 / US | [2013/52] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAERTEL, David, M. 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
PHINNEY, Daniel, P. 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Marybeth 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
LINK, Bruce, A. 343 State Street Rochester NM 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
HOLROYD, Bruce, A. 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11746374.5 | 03.08.2011 | [2016/44] | WO2011US46349 | Priority number, date | US20100858498 | 18.08.2010 Original published format: US 858498 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012024082 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2606632 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2606632 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H04N1/00795 (EP,US);
H04N1/0062 (EP,US);
H04N1/00631 (EP,US);
H04N1/00663 (EP,US);
H04N1/00687 (EP,US);
H04N1/00689 (EP,US);
H04N1/00692 (EP,US);
H04N1/00697 (EP,US);
H04N1/00726 (EP,US);
H04N1/00737 (EP,US);
H04N1/00742 (EP,US);
H04N1/00748 (EP,US);
H04N1/00771 (EP,US);
H04N1/00777 (EP,US);
H04N1/00779 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABTASTEN VON DOKUMENTEN | [2016/21] | English: | A METHOD OF SCANNING DOCUMENTS | [2013/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE BALAYAGE DE DOCUMENTS | [2016/21] |
Former [2013/26] | VERFAHREN ZUM SCANNEN VON DOKUMENTEN | ||
Former [2013/26] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA NUMÉRISATION DE DOCUMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 06.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2011 | AL | 02.11.2016 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | RS | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003076518 (MIYAKE HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0041] , [0042] , [0046] - [0049] - [0054] , [0055] , [0047]; figure 2 * [Y] 6,8; | [A]US2005206972 (SHIMIZU KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [XY]US2005240376 (UWATOKO KOUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10 * paragraphs [0105] - [0108] - [0111] , [0117] , [0127]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 6; | [XY]US2008013848 (WU WENCHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraphs [0046] - [0049] - [0051] - [0053]; figure 1 * [Y] 6; | [Y]US7490828 (MACHIDA AKIHIRO [US], et al) [Y] 6,8 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 21 * |