EP2557974 - IMPROVED VERTICAL GRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buzick, Bonnie Lee 6533 North Van Ness Boulevard Fresno, CA 93711 / US | For all designated states Bair, Robert James 6533 North Van Ness Boulevard Fresno, California 93711 / US | [2018/40] |
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states Buzick, Bonnie Lee 3258 Caminito Eastbluff, Suite 89 La Jolla, California 92037 / US | ||
For all designated states Bair, Robert James 6533 North Van Ness Boulevard Fresno, California 93711 / US | |||
Former [2018/09] | For all designated states Buzick, Bonnie Lee 3258 Caminito Eastbluff, Suite 89 La Jolla, California 92037 / US | ||
For all designated states Bair, Robert James 6533 North Van Ness Boulevard Fresno, California 93711 / US | |||
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Bair, Robert 6533 North Van Ness Boulevard Fresno, California 93711 / US | ||
For all designated states Buzick, Bonnie Lee 3258 Caminito Eastbluff, Suite 89 La Jolla, California 92037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | FRKelly, et al Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | FRKelly, et al 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2013/08] | Zeuner, Stefan, et al Zeuner Summerer Stütz Nußbaumstraße 8 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11746748.0 | 24.02.2011 | [2018/22] | WO2011AU00191 | Priority number, date | US20100592832 | 25.02.2010 Original published format: US 592832 | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011103621 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2557974 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2557974 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/07, A47J37/08 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
A47J37/0871 (EP,US);
A47J37/0718 (KR);
A47J37/0629 (US);
A47J37/0722 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/43] | A47J37/06, A47J37/08 | ||
Former IPC [2013/08] | A47J37/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER VERTIKALGRILL | [2013/08] | English: | IMPROVED VERTICAL GRILL | [2013/08] | French: | GRIL VERTICAL AMÉLIORÉ | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 26.09.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.10.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.09.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.10.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | LU | 24.02.2019 | MT | 24.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/31] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
MT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
MT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 30.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB440088 (ALFRED WALTERSPIEL); | [XAI]US3593648 (WALTERS ROY J); | [XAI]CA1134694 (POLASEK JOHN J, et al) | International search | [A]US3581654 (TESCULA JOHN C); | [A]US3742838 (LUSCHEN F, et al); | [A]US4619190 (SMITH DOUGLAS A [US]) |