EP2547260 - PATIENT SUPPORT FOR AN ODONTOLOGICAL X-RAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLANMECA OY Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARVA, Mikko c/o Planmeca Oy Asentajankatu 6 FI-00880 Helsinki / FI | [2013/04] | Application number, filing date | 11746920.5 | 23.02.2011 | WO2011FI50164 | Priority number, date | FI20100000078 | 23.02.2010 Original published format: FI 20100078 | [2013/04] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011104439 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2547260 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/14, A61B6/04, A61G15/14 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
A61B6/51 (EP,FI,KR,US);
A61B6/04 (EP,FI,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Title | German: | PATIENTENSTÜTZE FÜR EINE ZAHNÄRZTLICHE RÖNTGENVORRICHTUNG | [2013/04] | English: | PATIENT SUPPORT FOR AN ODONTOLOGICAL X-RAY APPARATUS | [2013/04] | French: | SUPPORT DE PATIENT POUR UN APPAREIL DE RADIOGRAPHIE ODONTOLOGIQUE | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2011 | Translation filed | 27.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees RS, HR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 12.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 12.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 12.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 12.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4400820 (O'DELL WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [I]WO2007078027 (VATECH CO LTD [KR], et al) | International search | [A]US3933154 (CABANSAG EDWIN M); | [A]US4400820 (O'DELL WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [X]DE3627510 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP1491145 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]); | [X]KR20070067519 (VALUE ADDED TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US2009175409 (STOECKL KLAUS [DE]) |