EP2539412 - AQUEOUS POLISHING AGENT AND GRAFT COPOLYMERS AND THEIR USE IN PROCESS FOR POLISHING PATTERNED AND UNSTRUCTURED METAL SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAN, Vijay, Immanuel Rennershofstrasse 12 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
GUBAYDULLIN, Ilshat Fritz-Lederle-Str. 13 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
BRANDS, Mario Siemensstrasse 20 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
LI, Yuzhuo Wieblinger Weg 33/4 69123 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
PERETOLCHIN, Maxim Friedrichsring 14 68161 Mannheim / DE | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Fitzner, Uwe Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11746939.5 | 19.01.2011 | WO2011IB50237 | Priority number, date | US20100307466P | 24.02.2010 Original published format: US 307466 P | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011104640 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2539412 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09G1/02, C09K3/14, C08F271/02 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
C09G1/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F283/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09K3/14 (KR);
C09K3/1463 (EP,US);
H01L21/321 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F283/00, C08F220/325 (US,KR,EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | C09G1/02, C09K3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGES POLIERMITTEL SOWIE PFROPFCOPOLYMERE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR POLIERUNG GEMUSTERTER UND UNSTRUKTURIERTER METALLOBERFLÄCHEN | [2017/03] | English: | AQUEOUS POLISHING AGENT AND GRAFT COPOLYMERS AND THEIR USE IN PROCESS FOR POLISHING PATTERNED AND UNSTRUCTURED METAL SURFACES | [2013/01] | French: | AGENT DE POLISSAGE AQUEUX ET COPOLYMÈRES GREFFÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS UN PROCÉDÉ POUR LE POLISSAGE DE SURFACES MÉTALLIQUES À MOTIF GRAVÉ ET NON STRUCTURÉES | [2013/01] |
Former [2013/01] | WÄSSRIGES REINIGUNGSMITTEL SOWIE PFROPFCOPOLYMERE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG GEMUSTERTER UND UNSTRUKTURIERTER METALLOBERFLÄCHEN | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 20.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2010127938 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [XP] 1-9,11-15 * page 11, line 34 - page 12, line 2 * * page 14, line 12 - line 18; claims 1-4,11,13-18 *; | [X]JP2009147267 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [X] 1,3,6,11,14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007]; claim 1 *; | [X]BE663786 (GAF) [X] 1,3,6,11,14 * page 13, line 16 - line 24; claims 1-4 * | International search | [A]WO2005014753 (DYNEA CHEMICALS OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO2006086265 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2007128873 (MINAMIHABA GAKU [JP], et al); | [A]CN1560161 (CHANGSHA RES INST OF MING & ME [CN]); | [A]JP2005101545 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT) |