EP2540521 - VEHICLE WHEEL MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Central Motor Wheel Co., Ltd. 1-7, Maruta Ozaki-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 446-0004 / JP | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2018/33] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Central Motor Wheel Co., Ltd. 1-7, Maruta Ozaki-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 446-0004 / JP | ||
For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Akihiro C/O CENTRAL MOTOR WHEEL CO. LTD. 1-7 Maruta Ozaki-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 446-0004 / JP | 02 /
FURUKAWA, Masahide C/O CENTRAL MOTOR WHEEL CO. LTD. 1-7 Maruta Ozaki-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 446-0004 / JP | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Chapman, Patrick Haseltine Lake LLP 5th Floor, Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11747099.7 | 20.01.2011 | [2018/33] | WO2011JP50921 | Priority number, date | JP20100038139 | 24.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010038139 | [2013/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011105135 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2540521 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2540521 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60B21/02, B21D53/30, B60B3/06, B60B3/10, B60B3/02, B60B21/04, // B60B3/16 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
B60B21/04 (EP,US);
B21D53/30 (EP,US);
B60B3/02 (EP,US);
B60B3/06 (EP,US);
B60B3/10 (EP,US);
B60B2310/204 (EP,US);
B60B2310/211 (EP,US);
B60B2310/302 (EP,US);
B60B2310/50 (EP,US);
B60B2900/133 (EP,US);
B60B3/16 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/11 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49492 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49503 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49524 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | B60B21/02, B21D53/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FAHRZEUGRÄDERN | [2013/01] | English: | VEHICLE WHEEL MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2013/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE ROUE DE VÉHICULE | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2012 | Translation filed | 16.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 15.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2011 | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | PT | 15.12.2018 | GB | 20.01.2019 | IE | 20.01.2019 | LU | 20.01.2019 | MT | 20.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.01.2011 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 20.01.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
MT | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 20.01.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
MT | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 20.01.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
MT | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 20.01.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 20.01.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0936083 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005186839 (WASHI KOSAN KK) [A] 1,2 * figure 7 *; | [A]JP2007145191 (ASAHI TEC CORP, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP1990213 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0026]; figure - * | International search | [A]JP2003326904 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2008126806 (ASAHI TEC CORP) | by applicant | JP2003326904 |