EP2540771 - VIBRATION-ISOLATING RUBBER COMPOSITION AND RUBBER VIBRATION ISOLATOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 1 Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi, Aichi 485-8550 / JP | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKAWA Yusuke c/o TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. 1 Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi Aichi 485-8550 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA Norihito c/o TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. 1 Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi Aichi 485-8550 / JP | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11747248.0 | 17.02.2011 | WO2011JP53409 | Priority number, date | JP20100039432 | 24.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010039432 | [2013/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011105284 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2540771 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2540771 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L7/00, C08K3/30, C08K9/06, C08L9/00 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/36, C08L7/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSISOLIERENDE KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND SCHWINGUNGSISOLIERENDER KAUTSCHUK DAMIT | [2013/01] | English: | VIBRATION-ISOLATING RUBBER COMPOSITION AND RUBBER VIBRATION ISOLATOR USING SAME | [2013/01] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC ISOLANT LES VIBRATIONS ET ISOLATEUR DE VIBRATIONS EN CAOUTCHOUC L'UTILISANT | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2012 | Translation filed | 19.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 21.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2011 | AL | 30.04.2014 | AT | 30.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | ES | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | HR | 30.04.2014 | IT | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | MK | 30.04.2014 | MT | 30.04.2014 | NL | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | RS | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | SM | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | NO | 30.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MK | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2007217562 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 80, Database accession no. 2007-864561, XP002711308 & JP2007217562 A 20070830 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-7 * page 10; table 1 * | International search | [A]JP2004108932 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2006052105 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD); | [A]JP2006337342 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]JP2007023155 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]JP2009215338 (DAISO CO LTD); | [A]JP2009256580 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD); | [AP]JP2010216952 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) | by applicant | JPH11193338 | JPH11255964 | JP2002003652 |