EP2540266 - DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING ABSORPTION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UKEGAWA, Kazuo c/o Technical Center Unicharm Corporation 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
NINOMIYA, Akihide c/o Technical Center Unicharm Corporation 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstraße 19 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Peter, Julian Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11747469.2 | 24.02.2011 | WO2011JP54178 | Priority number, date | JP20100043183 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010043183 | [2013/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011105509 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2540266 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/49, A61F13/53 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
A61F13/15658 (EP,US);
A61F13/15739 (EP,US);
A61F13/5323 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1737 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1741 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SAUGFÄHIGEN STRUKTUR | [2013/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING ABSORPTION STRUCTURE | [2013/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE D'ABSORPTION | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2012 | Translation filed | 21.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 04.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006021695 (BLESSING HORST [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0071] - [0076] - [0099]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2010004614 (ASHTON GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]US2007246147 (VENTURINO MICHAEL B [US], et al); | [A]JP2008508052 (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE CO.); | [A]US2007039690 (WALSH BRADLEY E [US], et al); | [A]US5149335 (KELLENBERGER STANLEY R [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2008508052 |