EP2539950 - MICROCAVITY OLEDS FOR LIGHTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, FL 32611 / US | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SO, Franky 5014 Nw 60th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | [2015/44] |
Former [2013/01] | 01 /
SO, Franky 5014 Nw 60th Terrace Gainesville FL 32653 / US | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Larcher, Dominique Cabinet Vidon, 16 B, rue Jouanet, BP 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11747921.2 | 22.02.2011 | WO2011US25667 | Priority number, date | US20100307191P | 23.02.2010 Original published format: US 307191 P | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011106306 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2539950 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/50 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
H10K85/631 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/856 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/852 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/35 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/1135 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | MIKROHOHLRAUM-OLEDS FÜR BELEUCHTUNGEN | [2013/01] | English: | MICROCAVITY OLEDS FOR LIGHTING | [2013/01] | French: | DELO À MICROCAVITÉ POUR ÉCLAIRAGE | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2006100138 (TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TEC); | [X]US2006220008 (KO CHUNG-WEN [TW]); | [X]WO2007141702 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al); | [X]JP2008091037 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |