EP2539707 - ARTIFICIAL MYCOLIC ACID MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Washington 4311 11th Avenue NE, Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98105-4608 / US | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNDLACH, Jens H. 13900 Northwood Road Nw Seattle, WA 98177 / US | 02 /
DERRINGTON, Ian M. 3636 Dayton Avenue North No. 4 Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 03 /
LANGFORD, Kyle W. 2343 Sunset Drive West University Place, WA 98466 / US | [2021/26] |
Former [2013/19] | 01 /
GUNDLACH, Jens, H. 13900 Northwood Road Nw Seattle WA 98177 / US | ||
02 /
DERRINGTON, Ian, M. 3636 Dayton Avenue North, nr. 4 Seattle WA 98103 / US | |||
03 /
LANGFORD, Kyle, W. 2343 Sunset Drive West University Place WA 98466 / US | |||
Former [2013/01] | 01 /
GUNDLACH, Jens, H. 13900 Northwood Road Nw Seattle WA 98177 / US | ||
02 /
DERRINGTON, Ian, M. 256 Northeast 50th Street Seattle WA 98105 / US | |||
03 /
LANGFORD, Kyle, W. 2343 Sunset Drive West University Place WA 98466 / US | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/26] |
Former [2013/01] | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11748021.0 | 23.02.2011 | [2021/26] | WO2011US25960 | Priority number, date | US20100375707P | 20.08.2010 Original published format: US 375707 P | US20100307441P | 23.02.2010 Original published format: US 307441 P | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011106456 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2539707 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2539707 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/15, G01N33/48, C12Q1/68, C07H21/04, B82Y15/00, B01D69/06 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/48721 (EP,US);
G01N27/44791 (US);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/35 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
G01N27/447 (US);
G01N27/44704 (US);
G01N27/44726 (US);
G01N27/44747 (US);
G01N27/44786 (US);
G06F1/206 (US);
G06F12/0238 (US);
G06F12/0246 (US);
G06F3/0604 (US);
G06F3/061 (US);
G06F3/0614 (US);
G06F3/0616 (US);
G06F3/0625 (US);
G06F3/0629 (US);
G06F3/0647 (US);
G06F3/0653 (US);
G06F3/0659 (US);
G06F3/0673 (US);
G06F3/0679 (US);
B01D2325/02 (EP,US);
B01D2325/24 (US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1016 (US);
G06F2212/7206 (US);
G11C7/04 (US);
Y02D10/00 (US);
Y10S977/712 (EP,US);
Y10S977/714 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | G01N33/15, G01N33/48, C12Q1/68, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHE MYCOLSÄUREMEMBRANEN | [2013/01] | English: | ARTIFICIAL MYCOLIC ACID MEMBRANES | [2013/01] | French: | MEMBRANES ARTIFICIELLES D'ACIDES MYCOLIQUES | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 24.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21175631.7 / EP3933402 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2019 | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2011 | AL | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | RS | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | LU | 23.02.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 23.02.2011 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.02.2011 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 30.06.2021 | |
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 30.06.2021 | |
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 30.06.2021 | |
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | BG | 30.09.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07248329 (NIPPON BIO RATSUDO LAB KK); | [XY]US2006008519 (DAVIDSEN JESPER [DK], et al); | International search | [X]JPH07248329 (NIPPON BIO RATSUDO LAB KK); | [A]US6406880 (THORNTON CHARLES G [US]); | [A]US2004063200 (CHAIKOF ELLIOT [US], et al); | [A]US2007269843 (THORNTON CHARLES G [US]) | by applicant | US4307229 | US4554101 | US4720456 | US5006514 | US5049664 | JPH07248329 | US6171830 | US6267872 | US6746594 | US2006008519 | US7189503 | US7238485 | US7514267 | WO2010034018 | US2010150966 | US2010196203 | US20080098938 |