EP2539011 - IMPROVED AND ENHANCED EXPLANT PROCESSES AND MECHANISMS FOR INTRAGASTRIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ReShape Medical, Inc. 236 Avenida Fabricante, Suite 201 San Clemente, CA 92672 / US | [2016/20] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Reshape Medical, Inc. 100 Calle Iglesia San Clemente, CA 92672 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUASAYSY, Outhit 11547 Chadwick Rd. Corona, CA 92880 / US | 02 /
ASHBY, Mark 23962 Frigate Dr. Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Stephen, Robert John, et al CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Stephen, Robert John, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 11748141.6 | 25.02.2011 | WO2011US26233 | Priority number, date | US20100308210P | 25.02.2010 Original published format: US 308210 P | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011106637 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2539011 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/10, A61F5/00 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
A61F5/0003 (EP,US);
A61F5/003 (EP,US);
A61F5/0033 (EP,US);
A61F5/0036 (EP,US);
A61M25/10184 (EP,US);
A61M25/1018 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | A61M25/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE UND VERSTÄRKTE EXPLANTATVERFAHREN UND -MECHANISMEN FÜR INTRAGASTRALE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2013/01] | English: | IMPROVED AND ENHANCED EXPLANT PROCESSES AND MECHANISMS FOR INTRAGASTRIC DEVICES | [2013/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'EXPLANTATION AMÉLIORÉS ET PERFECTIONNÉS ET MÉCANISMES POUR DISPOSITIFS INTRAGASTRIQUES | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 24.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008097513 (KAJI KUNIHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * Fig. 3 * [I] 2,3,8-15; | [XI]WO2009055386 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * Figs. 3a and 3b * [I] 2-6,9-15 | International search | [Y]US4356824 (VAZQUEZ RICHARD M); | [X]US5084061 (GAU FRED C [US], et al); | [A]US2008097513 (KAJI KUNIHIDE [JP], et al); | [A]US2008243166 (PAGANON PASCAL [FR], et al); | [Y] - "ReShape Inflatable Gastric Balloon Going on Trial as Weight Loss Option", MEDGADGET, INTERNET JOURNAL OF EMERGING MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, (20100204), URL: http://www.medgadget.com/archives/2010/02/reshape_inflatable_gastric_balloon system_going_on_trial_as_weight_loss_option.html, XP008160281 |