|
09.01.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
22.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
15 |
|
14.12.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
08.11.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.08.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.08.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.08.2012 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
24.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |