12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
19.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
05.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
17.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
06.01.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
28.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
02.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
29.01.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
21.12.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.12.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.09.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
04.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
23.10.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.05.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
31.05.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
03.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|