EP2593450 - SUBSTITUTED IMIDAZOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES AS KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piramal Enterprises Limited Piramal Tower Ganpatrao Kadam Marg Lower Parel Mumbai 400 013 / IN | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Sanjay Piramal Life Sciences Limited, 1, Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | 02 /
SHARMA, Rajiv Piramal Life Sciences Limited, 1, Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | 03 /
ZAHLER, Robert 5 East Welling Avenue Pennington NJ 08534 / US | 04 /
SAHU, Bichismita Piramal Life Sciences Limited, 1, Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | 05 /
AGARWAL, Veena, R. Piramal Life Sciences Limited, 1, Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | 06 /
NAIK, Nishigandha Piramal Life Sciences Limited, 1, Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | 01 /
KUMAR, Sanjay Piramal Life Sciences Limited 1 Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | ||
02 /
SHARMA, Rajiv Piramal Life Sciences Limited 1 Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | |||
03 /
ZAHLER, Robert 5 East Welling Avenue Pennington NJ 08534 / US | |||
04 /
SAHU, Bichismita Piramal Life Sciences Limited 1 Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | |||
05 /
AGARWAL, Veena, R. Piramal Life Sciences Limited 1 Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | |||
06 /
NAIK, Nishigandha Piramal Life Sciences Limited 1 Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway, Goregaon (East) Mumbai 400 063 / IN | Representative(s) | Richards, Michèle E. Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Richards, Michèle E. Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11748466.7 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011IB53161 | Priority number, date | US20100364927P | 16.07.2010 Original published format: US 364927 P | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012007926 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593450 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/02, A61K31/4745, A61P35/00 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE IMIDAZOCHINOLINDERIVATE ALS KINASEHEMMER | [2013/21] | English: | SUBSTITUTED IMIDAZOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES AS KINASE INHIBITORS | [2013/21] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'IMIDAZOQUINOLINE SUBSTITUÉS À TITRE D'INHIBITEURS DE KINASES | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 19.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2006029115 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 129; example 181 Step A * [A] 2-26; | [YA]WO2007075468 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,10-12 * page 62, line 9 - page 63, line 10; claims 1, 2, 5-34, 50-53 * [A] 2-4,6-9,13-26; | [YA]WO2009029609 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,10-12 * claims 1, 22-29 * [A] 2-4,6-9,13-26; | [YA]WO2006029155 (ORPHAN MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,10-12 * page 71, line 10 - page 72, line 10; claims 1-6, 8-17 * [A] 2-4,6-9,13-26; | [YA]WO2006122806 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1,5,10-12 * claims 1-7 * [A] 2-4,6-9,13-26 | by applicant | WO2006122806 | - J. MED. GENET., (2003), vol. 40, pages 494 - 502 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 2626 - 2631 | - NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2005), vol. 4, pages 988 - 1004 | - ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS, AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 24, page 1963 | - JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR SCREENING, (2002), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 441 - 450 | - ANTICANCER DRUGS, (2002), vol. 13, pages 1 - 8 | - AM. J. PHYSIOL. CELL PHYSIOL., (2003), vol. 285, pages C813 - C822 |