12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
19.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
12.05.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
03.06.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
31.05.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.05.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.05.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.04.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.04.2016 |
Change - French title |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
08.04.2016 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
01.04.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
01.04.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
22.01.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
28.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
13.09.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
07.06.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
03.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|