Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9209866 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2015 | B2 | US2013217325 | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1056913 | 31.08.2010 | WO2011EP64643 | 25.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103081370B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2015 | B | CN103081370 | 01.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1056913 | 31.08.2010 | WO2011EP64643 | 25.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2612447 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2016 | B1 | EP2612447 | 10.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1056913 | 31.08.2010 | WO2011EP64643 | 25.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012028532 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1056913 | 31.08.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2964276 | 07.09.2012 | B1 | FR2964276 | 02.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1056913 | 31.08.2010 |