EP2611742 - COMPOSITION, USE THEREOF AND PROCESS FOR REDUCING BULKING SLUDGE AND/OR FOAMING AND PREPARATION OF THE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V. Stationsstraat 77 3811 MH Amersfoort / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEERTS, Roy Oudlaan 34 NL-6708 RC Wageningen / NL | 02 /
EK, Aart De Bakspieker 18 NL-7609 CL Almelo / NL | 03 /
VAN GINKEL, Cornelis Gijsbertus Papenpad 22 NL-6705 CP Wageningen / NL | 04 /
REEDIJK, Marianne Frederika Waalzicht 6 NL-4051 BL Ochten / NL | 05 /
O, Boen Ho Koekoekstraat 14 NL-3514 CW Utrecht / NL | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Akzo Nobel IP Department Christian Neefestraat 2 1077 WW Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Akzo Nobel IP Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 11748690.2 | 30.08.2011 | WO2011EP64848 | Priority number, date | US20100379487P | 02.09.2010 Original published format: US 379487 P | EP20100175041 | 02.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10175041 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012028592 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611742 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/14, C02F1/52, C02F1/56 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
C02F1/5245 (EP);
B01D19/0404 (EP);
C02F1/54 (EP);
C02F3/1215 (EP);
C02F1/5272 (EP);
C02F1/56 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B01D19/0404, B01D19/0413 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, IHRE VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION VON SCHLAMMANSAMMLUNGEN UND /ODER SCHAUMBILDUNG SOWIE HERSTELLUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2013/28] | English: | COMPOSITION, USE THEREOF AND PROCESS FOR REDUCING BULKING SLUDGE AND/OR FOAMING AND PREPARATION OF THE COMPOSITION | [2013/28] | French: | COMPOSITION, SON UTILISATION, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DU FOISONNEMENT DES BOUES ET/OU DE FORMATION DE MOUSSE ET PRÉPARATION DE LA COMPOSITION | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 07.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CN101337759 (HARBIN INST OF TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [X] 1-10,12 * abstract *; | CN101337759 [ ]; | [X]WO2009053029 (ASHLAND LICENSING & INTELLECTU [US], et al) [X] 7-11 * page 20, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 32, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 35, paragraph 4 *; | [X]US6855268 (PESCHER YVETTE [FR], et al) [X] 7-11 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044]; claims 1-29 *; | [Y]WO2009156252 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 4, line 18 - line 30; claims 1-12 *; | [Y]US6207062 (DE RIGAUD JEAN-MATHIEU [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 2 * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 14, Database accession no. 2009-E28188, & CN101337759 A 20090107 (HARBIN INST TECHNOLOGY) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | - P. MADONI ET AL., WAT. RES., (2000), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 1767 - 1772 | - S. ROSSETTI ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS, (2005), vol. 29, pages 49 - 64 | - P.H. NIELSEN ET AL., ACTA HYDROCHIM. HYDROBIOL., (2005), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 255 - 261 | - C. KRAGELUND ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. ECOL., (2007), vol. 59, pages 671 - 682 | - L. SPEIRS ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (200904), pages 2446 - 2452 | - P.H. NIELSEN ET AL., ACTA HYDROCHIM. HYDROBIOL., (2005), vol. 3, pages 255 - 261 | - EIKELBOOM, PROCESS CONTROL OF ACTIVATED SLUDGE PLANTS BY MICROSCOPIC INVESTIGATION, (2000), pages 45 - 47 |