Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
31.03.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.10.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.11.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
10.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.08.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.06.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
07.06.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
06.03.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.02.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.02.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.02.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.03.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.03.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.11.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.09.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication |