EP2599339 - METHODS, WIRELESS TRANSMIT/RECEIVE UNIT AND SYSTEM FOR MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST MULTICAST SERVICES (MBMS) SERVICE FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/23] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST MULTICAST SERVICES (MBMS) SERVICE FEEDBACK | ||
[2014/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Peter, S. 412 Pond Path E. Setauket, New York 11733 / US | 02 /
STERN-BERKOWITZ, Janet, A. 41-20 Glenwood Street Little Neck, New York 11363 / US | 03 /
TAMAKI, Nobuyuki 9 3rd Street Manhasset, New York 11030 / US | 04 /
TERRY, Stephen E. 15 Summit Avenue Northport, New York 11768 / US | 05 /
LIU, Kai 12 Longstreet S. Huntington, New York 11746 / US | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Magnus Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [2013/23] | Application number, filing date | 11748794.2 | 27.07.2011 | WO2011US45483 | Priority number, date | US201113190987 | 26.07.2011 Original published format: US201113190987 | US20100373661P | 13.08.2010 Original published format: US 373661 P | US20100368541P | 28.07.2010 Original published format: US 368541 P | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012015884 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2599339 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2599339 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
H04W72/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L12/1863 (US);
H04W4/06 (KR);
H04W72/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W76/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, DRAHTLOSE SENDE-/EMPFANGSEINHEIT UND SYSTEM FÜR EINEN MBMS-FEEDBACK-SERVICE | [2014/17] | English: | METHODS, WIRELESS TRANSMIT/RECEIVE UNIT AND SYSTEM FOR MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST MULTICAST SERVICES (MBMS) SERVICE FEEDBACK | [2014/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, UNITÉ D'ÉMISSION/RECEPTION SANS FIL ET SYSTÈME POUR RETOUR D'INFORMATIONS SUR DES SERVICES DE DIFFUSION/MULTIDIFFUSION MULTIMÉDIA (MBMS) | [2014/17] |
Former [2013/23] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN MBMS-FEEDBACK-SERVICE | ||
Former [2013/23] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST MULTICAST SERVICES (MBMS) SERVICE FEEDBACK | ||
Former [2013/23] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR RETOUR D'INFORMATIONS SUR DES SERVICES DE DIFFUSION/MULTIDIFFUSION MULTIMÉDIA (MBMS) | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 05.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14189375.0 / EP2827620 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2011 | AL | 12.11.2014 | AT | 12.11.2014 | BE | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | IT | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MK | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | RS | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | SM | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | NO | 12.02.2015 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | IE | 27.07.2015 | LU | 27.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MK | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/48] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
IE | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 27.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 12.11.2014 | |
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 12.11.2014 | |
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - ERICSSON ET AL, "Counting for MBMS Rel-10", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-103865 COUNTING FOR MBMS REL-10, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100622), vol. RAN WG2, no. Stockholm, Sweden; 20100628, XP050451268 [X] 1-5,9-13,17-20 * the whole document * [Y] 6,14 [I] 7,8,15,16 | [X] - ZTE, "Uplink Feedback Approaches for MBMS", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-103731 UPLINK FEEDBACK APPROACHES FOR MBMS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100622), vol. RAN WG2, no. Stockholm, Sweden; 20100628, XP050451204 [X] 1,9,17,20 * the whole document * | [X] - HUAWEI, "MBMS reception status reporting", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-103978 MBMS RECEPTION STATUS REPORTING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, vol. RAN WG2, no. Stockholm, Sweden; 20100628, (20100622), URL: www.3gpp.org, (20110929), XP002660373 [X] 1,9,17,20 * the whole document * | [Y] - ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL, "Discuss on the UE MBMS reception status report", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-103686, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100622), vol. RAN WG2, no. Stockholm, Sweden; 20100628, XP050451180 [Y] 6,14 * the whole document * | [A] - CMCC, "Clarifications on the reception status reporting in R10 MBMS", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-103964 CLARIFICATIONS ON THE RECEPTION STATUS REPORTING IN R10 MBMS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, vol. RAN WG2, no. Stockholm, Sweden; 20100628, (20100622), URL: www.3gpp.org, (20110929), XP002660374 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US19410613685 | US19610613736 | US20110190987 |