EP2601526 - MAGNETIC IMMUNOSENSOR AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Point Of Care, Inc. 400 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Cary James 93 Chicksaw Crescent Ottawa Ontario K2M 1N2 / CA | 02 /
HU, Jinghua 18 Portadown Cres. Ottawa Ontario K2W 1E8 / CA | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Serravalle, Marco Serravalle SAS Via G. Matteotti, 21/23 26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT | [2016/51] |
Former [2013/24] | Serravalle, Marco Serravalle SAS Via Matteotti, 21/23 26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 11748815.5 | 05.08.2011 | [2016/51] | WO2011US46757 | Priority number, date | US20100371109P | 05.08.2010 Original published format: US 371109 P | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012019107 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2601526 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2601526 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/74, G01N33/543, B01L3/00 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
B01L3/502761 (EP,US);
G01N27/745 (US);
G01N33/54326 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (US);
B01L2200/0684 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2400/043 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0481 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/24] | G01N33/543, B01L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHER IMMUNSENSOR UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/24] | English: | MAGNETIC IMMUNOSENSOR AND METHOD OF USE | [2013/24] | French: | IMMUNOCAPTEUR MAGNÉTIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 06.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2011 | AL | 21.12.2016 | AT | 21.12.2016 | BE | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | ES | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | IT | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | NL | 21.12.2016 | PL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | TR | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | NO | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | IE | 05.08.2017 | LU | 05.08.2017 | MT | 05.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
TR | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
MT | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
MT | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
MT | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
MT | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
MT | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 21.12.2016 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0187458 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US], et al) [Y] 1-105 * paragraphs [0042] , [0 43] , [0 57] , [0 66] * * claims 1-86 *; | [YD]US2005054078 (MILLER CARY JAMES [CA], et al) [YD] 1-105 * the whole document * | [X] - PENG Z -C ET AL, "A bead-based electrochemical biosensor with integrated magnetic manipulation for controllable sample preconcentration", 15TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS. TRANSDUCERS 2009 IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2009), ISBN 978-1-4244-4190-7, pages 1802 - 1805, XP002659725 [X] 1-105 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7419821 | US5821399 | US4945045 | US4978610 | US5149630 | US7682833 | US7723099 | US5200051 | US7223438 | US7106051 | US2009191401 | US5587102 | US5843329 | US5998224 | US6294342 | US4230685 | US4554088 | US4628037 | US6231760 | US6764859 | US5554339 | - "Electroimmunoassay", LAURELL ET AL., Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1981), vol. 73, pages 339,340, - 348 | - M. J. GREEN, PHILOS. TRANS. R. SOC. LOND. B. BIOL. SCI., (1987), vol. 316, pages 135 - 142 | - BRULS ET AL., LAB CHIP, (2009), vol. 9, pages 3504 - 3510 | US20090288189 | US20110023009 | US20110017909 | US20090411325 |