Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2613828 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180042822 EP11749866 EP2011065301W KR20137005847 US201113226005



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101857834BGlobal Dossier 14.05.2018B1
KR20130101011 12.09.2013A
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010
WO2011EP65301 05.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103079618BGlobal Dossier 02.12.2015B
CN103079618 01.05.2013A
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010
WO2011EP65301 05.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2613828Global Dossier 27.11.2019B1
EP2613828 17.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010
EP11749866 05.09.2011
WO2011EP65301 05.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112013005283 24.09.2019A2
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010
WO2011EP65301 05.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2808287 15.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010
WO2011EP65301 05.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1182033 22.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010
WO2011EP65301 05.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2561570 27.08.2015C2
RU2013115274 20.10.2014A
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010
WO2011EP65301 05.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012032008Global Dossier 15.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2012055468Global Dossier 08.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR083156 06.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP10175427 06.09.2010