EP2543149 - CROSSTALK MITIGATION IN OPTICAL TRANSCEIVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onechip Photonics Inc. 495 March Road Suite 200 Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3G1 / CA | [2013/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATSON, Christopher 117 Blackburn Avenue Ottawa Ontario K1N 8A6 / CA | 02 /
VITIC, Michael 27 Chemin Wright Chelsea Quebec J9B 1M2 / CA | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11750110.6 | 01.03.2011 | WO2011CA00212 | Priority number, date | US20100715653 | 02.03.2010 Original published format: US 715653 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011106871 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2543149 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 09.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12, G02B6/42, H04J14/02, H04B10/69 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
H04B10/40 (EP,US);
G02B6/12002 (EP,US);
G02B6/12007 (EP,US);
G02B6/42 (EP,US);
H04B10/85 (EP,US);
H01S5/026 (EP,US);
H01S5/0264 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | H04B10/14, G02B6/12, G02B6/42, H04J14/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | ÜBERSPRECHUNGSUNTERDRÜCKUNG IN OPTISCHEN SENDE- UND EMPFANGSGERÄTEN | [2013/02] | English: | CROSSTALK MITIGATION IN OPTICAL TRANSCEIVERS | [2013/02] | French: | AFFAIBLISSEMENT DIAPHONIQUE DANS DES ÉMETTEURS-RÉCEPTEURS OPTIQUES | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 24.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0883254 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 38 - page 5, line 58; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19756296 (HERTZ INST HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 2,3,8,13* page 2, line 15 - page 7, line 52; figures 1-6 *; | [XAI]WO2005013517 (DENSELIGHT SEMICONDUCTORS PTE [SG], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10,11,15 * page 4, line 14 - line 22 * * page 7, line 6 - page 11, line 35; figures 5-12 * [A] 2,3,8,13 [I] 4,7,9,12,14 | International search | [A]US5859725 (SUGIYA HIDEAKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP1107485 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [X]WO2005013517 (DENSELIGHT SEMICONDUCTORS PTE [SG], et al); | [A]US2007029484 (ANDERSON SHANE M [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008014606 (ONECHIP PHOTONICS INC [CA], et al); | [A]US7492992 (TYAN RONGCHUNG [US], et al) |