EP2544162 - SURROUNDING AREA MONITORING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2015/18] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIMURA, Makoto c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
NAGAOKA, Nobuharu c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/02] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11750332.6 | 21.02.2011 | WO2011JP00949 | Priority number, date | JP20100044475 | 01.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010044475 | [2013/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011108218 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2544162 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2544162 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60R1/00, G06T1/00, H04N7/18, G06K9/00, G06T7/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
G01C3/14 (EP,US);
G06T7/593 (EP,US);
G06V40/10 (EP,US);
G08G1/166 (EP,US);
B60R2300/105 (EP,US);
B60R2300/305 (EP,US);
B60R2300/307 (EP,US);
B60R2300/8093 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10048 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30196 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30261 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | G08G1/16, B60R1/00, G06T1/00, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES UMGEBUNGSBEREICHS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2013/02] | English: | SURROUNDING AREA MONITORING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2013/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE ZONE ENVIRONNANTE POUR VÉHICULE | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2012 | Translation filed | 13.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2011 | AL | 29.04.2015 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | ES | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | IT | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MK | 29.04.2015 | NL | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | RS | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | SM | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 29.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2001006096 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2007241740 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2007310705 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2007310706 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-8* the whole document *; | [AD]JP2007334751 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2023267 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009102858 (EGGERS HELMUTH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010020170 (HIGGINS-LUTHMAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2008021035 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]JP2008254710 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) | by applicant | JP2001006096 | JP2007241740 | JP2007310705 | JP2007310706 | JP2007334751 | JP4334686B |