EP2543821 - ROTOR BLADE FOR GAS TURBINE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND GAS TURBINE USING ROTOR BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama 220-8401 / JP | [2015/16] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | ||
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADA, Satoshi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
IMADA, Takahiko C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
SHINTANI, Tomofumi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 04 /
OOE, Katsutoshi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 05 /
HIRATA, Norifumi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 06 /
ASANO, Hiroshi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11750550.3 | 24.02.2011 | [2015/45] | WO2011JP54164 | Priority number, date | WO2010JP71506 | 01.12.2010 Original published format: PCT/JP2010/071506 | JP20100046687 | 03.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010046687 | [2013/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011108440 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2543821 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2543821 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, // F01D5/22 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/18 (KR);
B23H9/10 (KR);
F02C7/00 (KR);
F02C7/18 (KR);
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | F01D5/18, B23H9/10, F01D25/00, F02C7/00, F02C7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTORBLATT FÜR EINE GASTURBINE, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND GASTURBINE MIT DEM ROTORBLATT | [2013/02] | English: | ROTOR BLADE FOR GAS TURBINE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND GAS TURBINE USING ROTOR BLADE | [2013/02] | French: | PALE DE ROTOR POUR TURBINE À GAZ, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET TURBINE À GAZ UTILISANT LADITE PALE DE ROTOR | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2012 | Translation filed | 10.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 27.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15181429.0 / EP2987955 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2011 | AL | 04.11.2015 | AT | 04.11.2015 | BE | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | HR | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | MK | 04.11.2015 | NL | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | RS | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | SM | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | NO | 04.02.2016 | GR | 05.02.2016 | GB | 24.02.2016 | IE | 24.02.2016 | LU | 24.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
GB | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
GB | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
GB | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
GB | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
GB | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
GB | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
GB | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007020100 (BEECK ALEXANDER R [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 1, paragraph 4; figures 1,4,5,6; claims 1,12 * * page 3, paragraphs 37, 44-46 * [Y] 2; | [XY]US2972807 (GEORGE TURNER PHILIP, et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 15 - line 52; figure 2 * [Y] 2; | [I]WO2004057157 (MACDONALD JOHN [GB], et al) [I] 5 * page 9, line 23 - page 12, line 34; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]JPH07119405 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 2 * figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]JPH03182602 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2007211618 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2009167934 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPH03151501 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPS6210402 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) | Examination | US2009297361 | US2985953 | JP2007211618 | by applicant | JP2007211618 |