EP2608659 - SYSTEM FOR METERING FEED IN FEED LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feedlogic Corporation 1717 16th Street NE, Floor 2 Willmar, Minnesota 56201 / US | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYDER, Drew 6480 Long Lake Road Willmar Minnesota 56201 / US | 02 /
TOVSEN, Neal 13475 Ferris Ave Apple Valley Minnesota 55124 / US | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Bird & Bird LLP Am Sandtorkai 50 20457 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11751760.7 | 23.08.2011 | WO2011US48802 | Priority number, date | US20100376386P | 24.08.2010 Original published format: US 376386 P | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012027364 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2608659 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01K5/02, G01G3/12, G01G11/00, G01G19/32 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
A01K5/0258 (EP,US);
A01K5/0275 (EP,US);
G01G11/003 (EP,US);
G01G19/32 (EP,US);
G01G23/3742 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR MESSUNG DER SPEISUNG IN SPEISELEITUNGEN | [2013/27] | English: | SYSTEM FOR METERING FEED IN FEED LINES | [2013/27] | French: | SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE MESURER L'ALIMENTATION DANS DES LIGNES D'ALIMENTATION | [2013/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 14.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2010065373 (UNIVATION TECH LLC [US]; BLICKLEY WILLIAM J [US]; DEARTH BUDDY L [US]) [Y] 1-21,25-45 * paragraphs [0008] - [0015] - [0026] - [0029] - [0036] - [0071] * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US5782201 (WELLS JOHN A [US]) [Y] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2170319 (WATCHORN SIMON JAMES; FRYERS WILLIAM HENRY) [Y] 22-24 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 9 * * page 2, line 79 - page 3, line 53 * * figure 1 *; | [XI]AT384147B (LEO BOEHM GES M B H [AT]) [X] 34-38,42,43 * the whole document * [I] 39,40,44,45; | [XI]US2006225516 (LUEHRS FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 34-36,42 * the whole document * [I] 37-40,43-45; | [XI]DE19517283 (MANNEBECK B LANDTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 34-36 * the whole document * [I] 37-45; | [XI]US4911940 (STEINER FERDINAND [US] ET AL) [X] 34-36 * column 4, lines 11-50 * * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 68 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 37-45; | [A]DE671808 (PETER KADER) [A] 1 * the whole document * |