EP2593206 - FILTRATION MEDIA AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELPARI, Vedagiri 230 Old Haymaker Road Monroeville Pennsylvania 15146 / US | 02 /
MENG, Jian 3740 Tea Olive Drive Gastonia North Carolina 28056 / US | 03 /
GILMORE, Dennis 290 California Terrace Pasadena California 91105 / US | 04 /
MARSH, Timothy, E. 2750 Hunters Circle Apt. 531 Allison Park Pennsylvania 15101 / US | 05 /
WATSON, James 444 Terrapin Lane Lake Wylie South Carolina 29710 / US | 06 /
HELLRING, Stuart 130 Oak Park Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15243 / US | 07 /
WESTBROOK, Paul, A. 112 Santa Clara Drive Shelby North Carolina 28152 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2013/21] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 11751975.1 | 14.07.2011 | WO2011US43988 | Priority number, date | US20100364197P | 14.07.2010 Original published format: US 364197 P | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012009521 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2593206 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/08, B01D39/16, B01D39/20 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
B01D39/086 (EP,US);
B01D39/083 (EP,US);
B01D39/1615 (EP,US);
B01D39/163 (EP,US);
B01D39/1692 (EP,US);
B01D39/2017 (EP,US);
B01D39/2065 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0208 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0216 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0464 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0478 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0492 (EP,US);
B01D2239/065 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0659 (EP,US);
B01D2239/086 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | 19.01.2013 | ME | 19.01.2013 | Title | German: | FILTRIERMEDIEN UND IHRE ANWENDUNG | [2013/21] | English: | FILTRATION MEDIA AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2013/21] | French: | MILIEUX DE FILTRATION ET LEURS APPLICATIONS | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 17.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0230097 (SIEBE GORMAN & CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,12,14,47 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 4 * [I] 41,42,50,51; | [X]US2004237790 (VON BLUCHER HASSO [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,12-16,20,21,41 * paragraphs [0016] , [0019] , [0023] , [0000] , [0026] - [0028] - [0032] , [0033] , [0035] , [0043] , [0045] *; | [X]DE202005018547U (BLUECHER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,36,37* paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [2528] , [0029] , [0035] - [0039] - [0041] , [0056] , [0058] * | by applicant | US3713962 | US4277531 | US4404717 | US4964891 | US2008207798 | US2009102100 | US19970613641 |