EP2611948 - METHOD FOR DEPOSITING NANOPARTICLES ON SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Namur Rue de Bruxelles 61 5000 Namur / BE | For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles Avenue Franklin Roosevelt, 50 CP 161 1050 Bruxelles / BE | For all designated states Centre de Recherche Public - Gabriel Lippmann Rue du Brill, 41 4422 Belvaux / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Université de Namur Rue de Bruxelles 61 5000 Namur / BE | ||
For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles Avenue Franklin Roosevelt 50 CP 161 1050 Bruxelles / BE | |||
For all designated states Centre de Recherche Public - Gabriel Lippmann Rue du Brill, 41 4422 Belvaux / LU | |||
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Facultés Universitaires Notre-Dame de la Paix Rue de Bruxelles, 61 5000 Namur / BE | ||
For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles Avenue Franklin Roosevelt 50 CP 161 1050 Bruxelles / BE | |||
For all designated states Centre de Recherche Public - Gabriel Lippmann Rue du Brill, 41 4422 Belvaux / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIREAUX, Jean-Jacques Avenue de la Lavande 17 B-5100 Jambes / BE | 02 /
RENIERS, François Clos des Chênes 5 B-1170 Bruxelles / BE | 03 /
GUILLOT, Jérôme CRP-GL Rue du Brill 41 LU-4422 Belvaux / LU | 04 /
GULAS, Michal LISE-PMR Facultés Universitaires Notre-Dame de la Paix Rue de Bruxelles 61 B-5000 Namur / BE | 05 /
CLAESSENS, Nicolas Rue René Rubay, 21A B-5032 Isnes / BE | 06 /
BATAN, Abdelkrim Rue Vanderdussen 48 B-1080 Bruxelles / BE | 07 /
MANSOUR, Ali CRP-GL Rue du Brill 41 LU-4422 Belvaux / LU | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [2013/28] | Application number, filing date | 11752208.6 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011EP65144 | Priority number, date | EP20100174984 | 01.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10174984 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012028695 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2611948 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/08, C23C18/14, C23C18/12 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
C23C18/08 (EP,US);
C23C18/1216 (EP);
C23C18/127 (EP);
C23C18/1291 (EP);
C23C18/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG VON NANOPARTIKELN AUF SUBSTRATEN | [2013/28] | English: | METHOD FOR DEPOSITING NANOPARTICLES ON SUBSTRATES | [2013/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT DE NANOPARTICULES SUR DES SUBSTRATS | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 17.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1323846 (AMT HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-11,15 * column 1, paragraph 4; claims 1,8,9,20 * * column 2, paragraph 8 * * column 3, paragraph 12 * * column 4, paragraph 17 * * column 5, paragraphs 22,26,27 * * column 7, paragraph 41 - column 8, paragraph 42 * * column 9, paragraph 47 - column 23, paragraph 111 * * examples 1-3,6,10,11,12,15,23-25,31,36 * [I] 5-7,12-14; | [Y]EP2207407 (STICHTING DUTCH POLYMER INST [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-4 * * column 2, paragraph 8 - column 3, paragraph 20 * * column 4, paragraph 31 * * column 5, paragraph 44 - column 6, paragraph 47 *; | [Y]GB2328692 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,7,9 * * page 3, lines 4-13; examples 1-14 *; | [Y]DE102008018939 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,5-7 * * page 2, paragraph 9 - page 3, paragraph 23 *; | [X]JP2009167031 (UNIV MIE) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XI]US2008145553 (BOULOS MAHER I [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,15 * claims 1-7 * * page 5, paragraphs 76,78 * [I] 7,11-14; | [Y]WO03086030 (DOW CORNING IRELAND LTD [IE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, paragraphs 1,3; claims 1,14 * * page 5, paragraph 15 - page 6, paragraph 17 * * page 12, paragraph 40 - page 13, paragraph 43 *; | [AD]WO2009021988 (UNIV BRUXELLES [BE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 12; claims 1,2,13 *; | [Y]WO2007103829 (ALTAIRNANO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * example 1; claims 1,4,5,10 * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraphs 3,4 * | by applicant | WO03086030 | WO2007103829 | JP2009167031 | WO2006079213 | TW248328B | US2008169182 | EP1323846 | US2008145553 | - BITTENCOURT ET AL., CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, (2008), vol. 462, pages 260 - 264 | - KOVACS ET AL., THIN SOLID FILMS, (2008), vol. 516, pages 7942 - 7946 | - CZEKAJ ET AL., APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, (2007), vol. 329, pages 68 - 78 | - GUO ET AL., JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 286, pages 274 - 279 | - SIMPLICIO ET AL., APPLIED CATALYSIS A, GENERAL, (2009), vol. 360, pages 2 - 7 | - LU, CARBON, (2007), vol. 45, pages 1599 - 1605 | - TZITZIOS ET AL., CARBON, (2006), vol. 44, pages 848 - 853 | - DEVARAJAN ET AL., JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 290, pages 117 - 129 | - LI ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, (2008), vol. 284, pages 1 - 7 | - WU ET AL., CHEM. MATER., (2001), vol. 13, pages 599 - 606 | - F. DEMOISSON ET AL., SURFACE AND INTERFACE ANALYSIS, (2008), vol. 40, pages 566 - 570 | WO2008EP60676 |