EP2598130 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION OF PERIOPERATIVE ARTERIAL HYPOTENSION IN HUMANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratoire Aguettant 1, rue Alexander Fleming 69007 Lyon / FR | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JULIA, Jean-Michel Le Lauréat 3 721 rue du Pré aux Clercs F-34090 Montpellier / FR | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11752302.7 | 27.07.2011 | WO2011FR51803 | Priority number, date | FR20100056209 | 28.07.2010 Original published format: FR 1056209 | [2013/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012022896 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2598130 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61P9/02 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/4748 (US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P9/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE PRÄVENTION VON PERIOPERATIVER ARTERIELLER HYPOTONIE BEI MENSCHEN | [2013/23] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION OF PERIOPERATIVE ARTERIAL HYPOTENSION IN HUMANS | [2013/23] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR LA PREVENTION DE L'HYPOTENSION ARTERIELLE PEROPERATOIRE CHEZ L' ETRE HUMAIN | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004136915 (DUGGER HARRY A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0010] *; | [XYI] - MATOSSI L'ORSA ET AL, "Special aspects of hypotension in spinal anesthesia (prevention of hypotension in geriatric surgery)", MINERVA ANESTESIOLOGICA 1966, (1966), vol. 32, no. 8, ISSN 0375-9393, pages 402 - 404, XP009153484 [X] 1-3 * page 404, column 1, paragraphs 7-9; figure 8 * [Y] 8,11 [I] 4-7,9,10 | [A] - GEORGE M. PALATIANOS ET AL, "Preoperative detection and management of immune heparin-induced thrombocytopenia in patients undergoing heart surgery with iloprost", THE JOURNAL OF THORACIC AND CARDIOVASCULAR SURGERY, (20040201), vol. 127, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.jtcvs.2003.08.042, ISSN 0022-5223, pages 548 - 554, XP055010803 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 549, column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 551, column 1, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtcvs.2003.08.042 | [A] - PAPADOPOULOS GEORGIOS ET AL, "Intravenous levosimendan-norepinephrine combination during off-pump coronary artery bypass grafting in a hemodialysis patient with severe myocardial dysfunction", JOURNAL OF CARDIOTHORACIC SURGERY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LO, (20100302), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1749-8090, page 9, XP021069599 [A] 1-11 * page 2, column 2, lines 22-39 * | [Y] - DHUNGANA Y ET AL, "Prevention of hypotension during propofol induction: a comparison of preloading with 3.5% polymers of degraded gelatin (Haemaccel) and intravenous ephedrine.", NEPAL MEDICAL COLLEGE JOURNAL : NMCJ MAR 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18700624, (200803), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 16 - 19, XP009153574 [Y] 8,11 * the whole document * | [Y] - GAMLIN F, "The haemodynamic effects of propofol in combination with ephedrine", ANAESTHESIA 1996 GB, (1996), vol. 51, no. 5, ISSN 0003-2409, pages 488 - 491, XP002662461 [Y] 8,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2044.1996.tb07799.x | [A] - SHAPIRO R A ET AL, "Skin necrosis following intravenous use of norepinephrine", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF SURGERY, PAUL HOEBER, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0002-9610(56)80088-3, vol. 92, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9610, (19561001), pages 566 - 570, (19561001), XP026477917 [A] 1-11 * page 566, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9610(56)80088-3 | [A] - BOCCARA GILLES ET AL, "Terlipressin versus norepinephrine to correct refractory arterial hypotension after general anesthesia in patients chronically treated with renin-angiotensin system inhibitors.", ANESTHESIOLOGY (HAGERSTOWN), (200306), vol. 98, no. 6, ISSN 0003-3022, pages 1338 - 1344, XP002602826 [A] 1-11 * page 1339, column 2, paragraph 3; table 1 * * page 1342, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [A] - OLDNER A ET AL, "A practice survey on vasopressor and inotropic drug therapy in Scandinavian intensive care units", ACTA ANAESTHESIOLOGICA SCANDINAVICA 200307 DK LNKD- DOI:10.1034/J.1399-6576.2003.00129.X, (200307), vol. 47, no. 6, ISSN 0001-5172, pages 693 - 701, XP002602827 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 2 * | [A] - WRENGER E ET AL, "AMBULATORY TREATMENT WITH INTRAVENOUS NOREPINEPHRINE IN A PATIENT WITH END STAGE RENAL DISEASE AND GENERALIZED AA AMYLOIDOSIS", AMYLOID: THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, PARTHENON PUBLISHING GROUP, LANCS, GB, (20020301), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1350-6129, pages 47 - 51, XP009042533 [A] 1-11 * page 48, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [A] - GOERTZ A W ET AL, "The effect of phenylephrine bolus administration on left ventricular function during isoflurane-induced hypotension", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1993), Database accession no. EMB-1993221432, XP002602828 [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [ ] - ANESTHESIA AND ANALGESIA 1993 US, (1993), vol. 77, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2999, pages 227 - 231 | by applicant | - GOLDMAN L, CALDERA D, "Risks of general anaesthesia and elective operation in the hypertensive patients", ANESTHESIOLOGY, (1979), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 285 - 292 | - LIENHART A, AUROY Y, PÉQUIGNOT F ET AL., "Survey of anesthesia-related mortality in France", ANESTHESIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 105, pages 1087 - 97 | - BIJKER JB, VAN KLEI WA, VERGOUWE Y ET AL., "Intraoperative hypotension and 1-year mortality after noncardiac surgery", ANESTHESIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 111, pages 1217 - 26 | - KHETERPAL S, TREMPER KK, ENGLESBE MJ, O'REILLY M, SHANKS AM, FETTERMAN DM ET AL., "Predictors of postoperative acute renal failure after noncardiac surgery in patients with previously normal renal function", ANESTHESIOLOGY, (200712), vol. 107, no. 6, pages 892 - 902 | - G.PAPADOPOULOS, JOURNAL OF CARDIOTHORACIC SURGERY, (2010), vol. 5, page 9 | - HUET O., DURANTEAU J., "Place des agents vasoactifs en chirurgie non cardiaque", CONFéRENCE D'ACTUALISATION, (1999), pages 161 - 173 | - "Contrôle de la pression artérielle de la fréquence cardiaque en anesthésie", SAMAIN E, PILI-FLOURY S, BARRUCAND B., 5 1 ème congrès national d'anesthésie et de réanimation, ELSEVIER MASSON, (2009), page 6,7 | - SAAGER L. ET AL., "Vasopressors May Reduce Mortality Associated with a ''Triple Low '' of Low Blood Pressure", BIS, AND MAC, ASA, (2009), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 285 - 292 |