EP2611594 - METHOD OF MAKING A MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE AND RELATED LAMINATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/28] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A MICROFLUIDIC APPARATUS AND RELATED LAMINATING DEVICES | ||
[2018/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Microparts GmbH Hauert 7 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Microparts GmbH Hauert 7 44227 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUROWSKI, Dirk Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 02 /
PAUL, Oliver Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2013/28] | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 11752518.8 | 30.08.2011 | [2018/22] | WO2011EP64857 | Priority number, date | EP20100009072 | 01.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10009072 | [2013/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012028595 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611594 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611594 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/30, B01L3/00, F16K99/00 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B32B37/30 (US);
B01L3/502738 (EP,US);
F16K99/0001 (EP,US);
F16K99/0015 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2300/123 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0481 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0655 (EP,US);
F16K2099/008 (EP,US);
Y10T156/16 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | B29C51/18, B01L3/00, F16K99/00, B81C1/00, B29C51/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER MIKROFLUIDISCHEN VORRICHTUNG SOWIE DIESBEZÜGLICHE LAMINIEREINRICHTUNGEN | [2013/28] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING A MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE AND RELATED LAMINATING APPARATUS | [2018/01] | French: | PROCEDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF MICROFLUIDIQUE ET APPAREIL DE LAMINAGE QUI Y SONT ASSOCIÉS | [2018/01] |
Former [2013/28] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A MICROFLUIDIC APPARATUS AND RELATED LAMINATING DEVICES | ||
Former [2013/28] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF MICROFLUIDIQUE ET APPAREILS DE STRATIFICATION POUR CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 24.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 24.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2011 | AL | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | MT | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | AT | 30.08.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | IE | 30.08.2018 | LU | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.08.2011 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MK | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.08.2011 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 30.08.2011 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0055082 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 21 - page 7, line 5; figure - *; | [A]WO9426414 (SYNTEX INC [US]) [A] 3-6,9-11,13-15 * page 15, line 45 - page 16, line 11; figure - *; | [X]DE10134040 (KARLSRUHE FORSCHZENT [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0035]; figure - * * abstract *; | [A]US2006057030 (LEE JAE-YONG [KR], et al) [A] 1,3,7,9,12,14 * figure 2; claim - *; | [A]GB2445738 (LAB901 LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XD]EP2138233 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM MICROPART [DE]) [XD] 1-3,7,9,12,14 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0101]; figure 11 *; | [A]EP2210666 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,7,9,12,14* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2008071351 | EP2138233 |