EP2511399 - APPARATUS FOR GENERATING FLUORINE GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Central Glass Company, Limited 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZAKI, Tatsuo c/o Chemical Research Center CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube, Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | 02 /
YAO, Akifumi c/o Chemical Research Center CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube, Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | 03 /
KITA, Takuya c/o Chemical Research Center CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube, Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11753198.8 | 24.02.2011 | WO2011JP54103 | Priority number, date | JP20110020868 | 02.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011020868 | JP20100051316 | 09.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010051316 | [2012/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011111538 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2511399 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C25B9/00, B01D53/04, C25B1/24 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
C25B1/245 (EP,US);
C25B1/24 (KR);
B01D53/0423 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/0446 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/685 (EP,KR,US);
C25B15/021 (KR);
C25B15/08 (EP,US);
C25B9/00 (KR);
B01D2256/26 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/2047 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FLUORGASERZEUGUNG | [2012/42] | English: | APPARATUS FOR GENERATING FLUORINE GAS | [2012/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE FLUOR GAZEUX | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2012 | Translation filed | 09.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 01.07.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5275659 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD); | [Y]JPH03270712 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005264231 (AIR LIQUIDE) | by applicant | JP2009215588 |