EP2546303 - CURABLE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNAYAMA, Yoshitaka c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
HATANAKA, Yuki c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Hideaki c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11753455.2 | 10.03.2011 | WO2011JP55701 | Priority number, date | JP20100056555 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010056555 | [2013/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011111797 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2546303 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/02, C08G65/325, C08K3/32, C08K5/04, C08K5/521 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
C08G65/336 (EP,US);
C08G18/77 (KR);
C08G65/325 (KR);
C08L71/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L75/04 (KR);
C08K5/5435 (EP,US);
C08K5/544 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2013/03] | English: | CURABLE COMPOSITION | [2013/03] | French: | COMPOSITION DURCISSABLE | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2012 | Translation filed | 11.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 14.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 02.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]WO2008004482 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009173856 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11315138 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [Y]JP2002513818 (BAYER ANTWERPEN N.V.); | [A]WO2004067633 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JPH08176429 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH0372527 | JPH0347825 | JP2009173856 | WO2007074736 | JP2010056555 |