01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
08.03.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
30.03.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
26.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.03.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.02.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.10.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.10.2017 |
Change - inventor |
|
20.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
20.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
20.10.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
20.10.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
20.10.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
08.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
23.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
12.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.10.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
11.07.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
11.07.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
11.07.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
15.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
01.07.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.05.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
05.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
14.12.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
20.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|