EP2606182 - EMULSIONS FOR REMOVAL AND PREVENTION OF DEPOSITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solenis Technologies Cayman, L.P. Mühlentalstrasse 38 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2015/47] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Solenis Technologies Cayman, L.P. Rheinweg 11 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Ashland Licensing And Intellectual Property, LLC 5200 Blazer Parkway Dublin, OH 43017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIERGANNS, Patric Grenzstr. 147 47799 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
BROECHER, Markus Westminsterstr. 93 45470 Mühlheim an der Ruhr / DE | 03 /
KANTO-OEQUIST, Charlotta Am Beyertzhof 20 47906 Kempen / DE | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11754292.8 | 12.08.2011 | [2016/01] | WO2011EP04067 | Priority number, date | EP20100008719 | 20.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10008719 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012022451 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2606182 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2606182 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/04, D21C9/08, C11D7/50 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
C11D17/0017 (EP,US);
D21H21/04 (KR);
C11D1/825 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
C11D7/50 (KR);
D21C9/08 (EP,KR,US);
D21H21/00 (KR);
C11D1/662 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMULSIONEN ZUR ENTFERNUNG UND VERMEIDUNG VON ABLAGERUNGEN | [2013/26] | English: | EMULSIONS FOR REMOVAL AND PREVENTION OF DEPOSITS | [2013/26] | French: | EMULSIONS POUR L'ÉLIMINATION ET LA PRÉVENTION DE DÉPÔTS | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2011 | AL | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | RS | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | IE | 12.08.2016 | LU | 12.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.08.2011 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 12.08.2016 | ||
LU | 12.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.08.2011 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 12.08.2016 | ||
LU | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.08.2011 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 12.08.2016 | ||
LU | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 12.08.2016 | ||
LU | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | HR | 06.01.2016 | |
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | HR | 06.01.2016 | |
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | HR | 06.01.2016 | |
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | HR | 06.01.2016 | |
GR | 07.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5139616 (LING TIEN-FENG [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0109434 (HERCULES INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-35 *; | [A]US6150452 (LING TIEN-FENG [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 36; claims 1-39 *; | [A]CA2291882 (VININGS IND INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 11; examples 1-5; claims 1-38 * | by applicant | EP0562739 | EP0558360 | DE4136445 | EP0517360 | EP0731776 | EP0828889 | WO2006097321 | - D.R. CACCIONI ET AL., INT J FOOD MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 43, no. 1-2, pages 73 - 9 | - GRIFFIN WC, JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF COSMETIC CHEMISTS, (1949), vol. 1, page 311 | - GRIFFIN WC, JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF COSMETIC CHEMISTS, (1954), vol. 5, page 259 | - DAVIES JT, "Gas/Liquid and Liquid/Liquid Interface", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF SURFACE ACTIVITY, (1957), pages 426 - 438 |