EP2659561 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR SUPERVISION OF CURRENT TRANSFORMER IN A DIFFERENTIAL PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUHA, Ylinen Koviotie 3 as 9 FI-65230 Vaasa / FI | 02 /
NAYAN, Shah Aakash Opp Arun Bunglow New SBI Lalbaug Manjalpur Naka Vadodara 390011 Gujarat / IN | 03 /
MURALI, Kandakatta H-No 3-124 Penchikalapet Atmakur 506342 (Mandal) Warangal (District) Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11754475.9 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB01318 | Priority number, date | IN2010CHE4046 | 31.12.2010 Original published format: IN CH40462010 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012090036 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659561 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2659561 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/045 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
H02H7/045 (EP,US);
H02H7/042 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES STROMWANDLERS IN EINEM DIFFERENTIALSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2013/45] | English: | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR SUPERVISION OF CURRENT TRANSFORMER IN A DIFFERENTIAL PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2013/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL SERVANT À SUPERVISER UN TRANSFORMATEUR DE COURANT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION DIFFÉRENTIEL | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 13.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2011 | AL | 01.04.2015 | AT | 01.04.2015 | BE | 01.04.2015 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | HR | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MK | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | RS | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | SM | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | IE | 10.06.2015 | LU | 10.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | NO | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MK | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1696531 (AREVA T & D UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010202092 (GAJIC ZORAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0026] - [0049]; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP1696531 | US2010202092 |